AK SB59 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-18 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/17/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-18 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/17/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the operation of low-speed vehicles.
Title
Low- Speed Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-18 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/17/10 | |
2010-02-18 | SIGNED INTO LAW 2/16 CHAPTER 1 SLA 10 | |
2010-02-03 | 3:40 PM 2/2/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-01-27 | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- E1 | |
2010-01-27 | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP | |
2010-01-25 | VERSION: HCS CSSB 59(TRA) | |
2010-01-25 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED | |
2010-01-25 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): P.WILSON | |
2010-01-25 | PASSED Y39 A1 | |
2010-01-25 | AM NO 1 NOT OFFERED | |
2010-01-25 | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-01-25 | FN2: ZERO(H.RLS) | |
2010-01-25 | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 59(TRA) | |
2010-01-25 | RULES TO CALENDAR 1/25/2010 | |
2009-04-19 | RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE | |
2009-04-18 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/19 CALENDAR | |
2009-04-18 | TRA HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-18 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-04-18 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | FN1: ZERO(DOT) | |
2009-04-15 | NR: JOHANSEN, DOOGAN, JOHNSON | |
2009-04-15 | DP: MUNOZ, GRUENBERG, P.WILSON | |
2009-04-15 | TRA RPT HCS(TRA) 3DP 3NR | |
2009-04-14 | TRA | |
2009-04-14 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-04-13 | VERSION: CSSB 59(TRA) AM | |
2009-04-13 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2009-04-13 | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y15 N- E1 A3 V1 | |
2009-04-13 | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING | |
2009-04-13 | AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y15 N- E1 A3 V1 | |
2009-04-13 | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-13 | IN THIRD READING ON RECONSIDERATION | |
2009-04-13 | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-13 | ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION | |
2009-04-13 | PASSED Y17 N1 E1 V1 | |
2009-04-13 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 59(TRA) AM | |
2009-04-13 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-13 | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-13 | TRA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-13 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-04-13 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2009 | |
2009-04-11 | FN1: ZERO(DOT) | |
2009-04-11 | NR: FRENCH, WIELECHOWSKI, MCGUIRE | |
2009-04-11 | DP: THERRIAULT | |
2009-04-11 | JUD RPT CS(TRA) 1DP 3NR | |
2009-03-05 | FN1: ZERO(DOT) | |
2009-03-05 | DP: KOOKESH, MEYER, DAVIS, PASKVAN | |
2009-03-05 | TRA RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE | |
2009-01-21 | TRA, JUD | |
2009-01-21 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-01-21 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/16/09 |