AK SB54 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/17/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Alaska Railroad Corp. Land Transfers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alaska Railroad Corp. Land Transfers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-16SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/17/19
2019-08-16SenateSIGNED INTO LAW 8/16 CHAPTER 21 SLA 19
2019-08-13Senate11:31 AM 8/13/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2019-05-01HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): JACKSON
2019-05-01HouseVERSION: SB 54
2019-05-01HouseRETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2019-05-01HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2019-05-01HousePASSED Y36 N1 A3
2019-05-01HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 54
2019-05-01HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-05-01HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-05-01HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/2019
2019-04-24HouseFN1: ZERO(CED)
2019-04-24HouseDP: TALERICO, STORY, RASMUSSEN, DRUMMOND, CLAMAN, WOOL, STUTES
2019-04-24HouseTRA RPT 7DP
2019-04-08HouseTRA
2019-04-08HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-04-05SenateVERSION: SB 54
2019-04-05SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2019-04-05SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2019-04-05SenatePASSED Y18 N- E2
2019-04-05SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 54
2019-04-03SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/5 CALENDAR
2019-04-03SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-04-03SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/3/2019
2019-03-29SenateFN1: ZERO(CED)
2019-03-29SenateNR: STEDMAN, SHOWER, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, WILSON
2019-03-29SenateDP: VON IMHOF, MICCICHE, HOFFMAN, BISHOP
2019-03-29SenateFIN RPT 4DP 5NR
2019-03-20SenateCOSPONSOR(S): BISHOP
2019-03-15SenateFN1: ZERO(CED)
2019-03-15SenateDP: HUGHES, WILSON, SHOWER, KIEHL
2019-03-15SenateTRA RPT 4DP
2019-02-13SenateTRA, FIN
2019-02-13SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback