AK SB5 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - REFERRED TO COMMUNITY & REGIONAL AFFAIRS
Pending: House Community & Regional Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act prohibiting certain groups from soliciting and accepting contributions or from making certain contributions and expenditures during a regular or special legislative session; and prohibiting some lobbyists from making campaign contributions to certain groups.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Political Contribution Limits/prohibition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 4? (Y: 6 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 3? (Y: 7 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 3? (Y: 7 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2? (Y: 8 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1? (Y: 7 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-10HouseREFERRED TO COMMUNITY & REGIONAL AFFAIRS
2017-04-10HouseCRA, STA, JUD
2017-04-10HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-04-10SenateVERSION: CSSB 5(JUD)
2017-04-10SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2017-04-07SenateENGROSSED
2017-04-07SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2017-04-07SenateAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2017-04-07SenateAM NO 4 FAILED Y6 N14
2017-04-07SenateAM NO 3 FAILED Y7 N13
2017-04-07SenateREMAIN IN SECOND FOR ALL AMENDMENTS UC
2017-04-07SenateAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2017-04-07SenateAM NO 2 FAILED Y8 N12
2017-04-07SenateRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UC
2017-04-07SenateAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2017-04-07SenateAM NO 1 FAILED Y7 N13
2017-04-07SenateRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC
2017-04-06SenateHELD IN THIRD READING
2017-04-06SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 5(JUD)
2017-04-05SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/6 CALENDAR
2017-04-05SenateJUD CS ADOPTED UC
2017-04-05SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-05SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/5/2017
2017-03-31SenateFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2017-03-31SenateDP: COGHILL, KELLY, COSTELLO, MEYER
2017-03-31SenateJUD RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE
2017-02-10SenateFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2017-02-10SenateNR: DUNLEAVY, WILSON
2017-02-10SenateDP: EGAN, COGHILL, GIESSEL
2017-02-10SenateSTA RPT CS 3DP 2NR SAME TITLE
2017-01-18SenateSTA, JUD
2017-01-18SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-01-09SenatePREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback