AK SB47 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to special registration plates for vehicles owned by persons with disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Registration/persons W/disability

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18SenateAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2021-05-17HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): TARR, JOSEPHSON, RASMUSSEN, DRUMMOND
2021-05-17HouseVERSION: SB 47
2021-05-17HouseRETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2021-05-17HousePASSED Y38 N2
2021-05-17HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 47
2021-05-17HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2021-05-17HouseAM NO 4 FAILED N40
2021-05-17HouseAM NO 3 FAILED Y10 N30
2021-05-17HouseAM NO 2 NOT OFFERED
2021-05-17HouseAM NO 1 RULED OUT OF ORDER AND WITHDRAWN
2021-05-17HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2021-05-17HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2021
2021-05-14HouseFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2021-05-14HouseNR: KAUFMAN, VANCE
2021-05-14HouseDNP: EASTMAN
2021-05-14HouseDP: CLAMAN, STORY, TARR, KREISS-TOMKINS
2021-05-14HouseSTA RPT 4DP 1DNP 2NR
2021-04-30HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): STORY, TUCK
2021-04-30HouseSTA
2021-04-30HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-04-30SenateVERSION: SB 47
2021-04-30SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2021-04-30SenateCOSTELLO, HOLLAND, MICCICHE
2021-04-30SenateCOSPONSOR(S): BISHOP, SHOWER, REVAK, BEGICH, STEVENS, KAWASAKI, VON IMHOF,
2021-04-30SenatePASSED Y16 N- E4
2021-04-30SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 47
2021-04-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2021-04-30SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2021-04-30SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/2021
2021-04-23SenateFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2021-04-23SenateDP: SHOWER, HOLLAND, KAWASAKI, COSTELLO
2021-04-23SenateSTA RPT 4DP
2021-01-25SenateSTA
2021-01-25SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback