AK SB47 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-04-08 - FN1: (CED)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the State Physical Therapy and Occupational Therapy Board; relating to the practice of physical therapy; and relating to the practice of occupational therapy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physical/occupational Therapy Bd/practice

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-08HouseFN1: (CED)
2020-04-08HouseFN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 205
2020-04-08HouseLEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 4/3/20
2020-05-19SenateLEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 4/3/20
2020-03-21HouseREFERRED TO FINANCE
2020-03-21HouseFIN
2020-03-21HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2020-03-20SenateVERSION: CSSB 47(FIN)
2020-03-20SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2020-03-20SenatePASSED Y17 N- E3
2020-03-20SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 47(FIN)
2020-03-20SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2020-03-20SenateFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2020-03-20SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2020-03-20SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 3/20/2020
2020-03-18SenateFN1: (CED)
2020-03-18SenateNR: STEDMAN, WILSON, WIELECHOWSKI
2020-03-18SenateDP: VON IMHOF, HOFFMAN, BISHOP
2020-03-18SenateFIN RPT CS 3DP 3NR SAME TITLE
2020-02-12SenateFN1: (CED)
2020-02-12SenateDP: BISHOP, STEVENS, REVAK
2020-02-12SenateL&C RPT CS 3DP SAME TITLE
2019-02-08SenateL&C, FIN
2019-02-08SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback