AK SB46 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/29/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act establishing October 25 of each year as African American Soldiers' Contribution to Building the Alaska Highway Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oct 25: Afr-amer Soldiers Ak Hwy Day

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-03SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/29/17
2017-05-03SenateSIGNED INTO LAW 4/30 CHAPTER 5 SLA 17
2017-04-14Senate3:03 PM 4/14/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2017-04-05HouseTARR, STUTES, SPOHNHOLZ, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, SEATON, PRUITT, THOMPSON, JOSEPHSON
2017-04-05HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): PARISH, WOOL, GUTTENBERG, BIRCH, DRUMMOND, FANSLER, JOHNSON,
2017-04-05HouseVERSION: SB 46
2017-04-05HouseRETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2017-04-05HousePASSED Y39 N1
2017-04-05HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 46
2017-04-03HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): GRENN, WESTLAKE
2017-04-03HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/5 CALENDAR
2017-04-03HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-03-31HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK, GARA
2017-03-31HouseHELD TO 4/3 CALENDAR
2017-03-31HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/31/2017
2017-03-29HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): MILLETT
2017-03-24HouseFN1: ZERO(MVA)
2017-03-24HouseDP: JOHNSON, WOOL, LEDOUX, KNOPP, BIRCH, TUCK, KREISS-TOMKINS
2017-03-24HouseSTA RPT 7DP
2017-03-13HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): KOPP
2017-03-10HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
2017-03-08HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI
2017-03-08HouseSTA
2017-03-08HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-03-06SenateVERSION: SB 46
2017-03-06SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2017-03-06SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2017-03-06SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 46
2017-03-06SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-03-06SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-03-06SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 3/6/2017
2017-03-01SenateFN1: ZERO(MVA)
2017-03-01SenateDP: EGAN, GIESSEL, WILSON
2017-03-01SenateNR: DUNLEAVY
2017-03-01SenateSTA RPT 3DP 1NR
2017-02-17SenateFN1: ZERO(MVA)
2017-02-17SenateDP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, WILSON, EGAN
2017-02-17SenateTRA RPT 4DP
2017-02-15SenateCOSPONSOR(S): DUNLEAVY, MICCICHE, VON IMHOF, STEDMAN
2017-02-01SenateSTEVENS, MACKINNON, GIESSEL, COSTELLO, BISHOP
2017-02-01SenateCOSPONSOR(S): BEGICH, WIELECHOWSKI, MEYER, OLSON, EGAN, HUGHES, GARDNER,
2017-02-01SenateTRA, STA
2017-02-01SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback