AK SB41 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the number of superior court judges in the third judicial district; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Number Of Superior Court Judges
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-05 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/19 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 5/6 CHAPTER 2 SLA 19 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | 10:55 A.M. 4/30/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-04-05 | House | VERSION: SB 41 |
2019-04-05 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2019-04-05 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2019-04-05 | House | PASSED Y36 E4 |
2019-04-05 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 41 |
2019-04-05 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2019-04-05 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-04-05 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/5/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | FN1: (AJS) |
2019-04-03 | House | NR: PRUITT |
2019-04-03 | House | DP: STUTES, EDGMON, JOHNSTON, THOMPSON, EASTMAN, KOPP |
2019-04-03 | House | RLS RPT 6DP 1NR |
2019-04-01 | House | RLS |
2019-04-01 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2019-03-29 | Senate | VERSION: SB 41 |
2019-03-29 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2019-03-29 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2019-03-29 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2019-03-29 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 41 |
2019-03-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2019-03-29 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-03-29 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/21/2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | FN1: (AJS) |
2019-03-20 | Senate | BISHOP |
2019-03-20 | Senate | DP: VON IMHOF, STEDMAN, MICCICHE, HOFFMAN, SHOWER, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, WILSON, |
2019-03-20 | Senate | FIN RPT 9DP |
2019-02-18 | Senate | FN1: (AJS) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | DP: HUGHES, REINBOLD, MICCICHE |
2019-02-18 | Senate | JUD RPT 3DP |
2019-01-30 | Senate | JUD, FIN |
2019-01-30 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |