AK SB4 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-17 - RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-17 - RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the Alaska coastal management program; establishing the Alaska Coastal Policy Board; and providing for an effective date by repealing the effective date for the repeal of certain provisions relating to the Alaska coastal management program.
Title
Coastal Management Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-17 | RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE | |
2010-04-17 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 4(FIN) | |
2010-04-17 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-17 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-17 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-17 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | FN4: (DEC) | |
2010-04-14 | FN3: (DNR) | |
2010-04-14 | NR: STEDMAN | |
2010-04-14 | DNP: HUGGINS, THOMAS, EGAN | |
2010-04-14 | DP: HOFFMAN, OLSON, ELLIS | |
2010-04-14 | FIN RPT CS 3DP 3DNP 1NR NEW TITLE | |
2010-03-24 | RES REFERRAL WAIVED | |
2009-02-06 | FN2: (DNR) | |
2009-02-06 | FN1: (DEC) | |
2009-02-06 | NR: FRENCH, MENARD | |
2009-02-06 | DP: OLSON, THOMAS, KOOKESH | |
2009-02-06 | CRA RPT CS 3DP 2NR SAME TITLE | |
2009-01-21 | CRA, RES, FIN | |
2009-01-21 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-01-21 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/09 |
Subjects
Administrative Procedure
Boards & Commissions
Coastal Management
Environmental Concerns
Fish & Game (both)
Government Organization
Hazardous Substances
Hearings
Land
Permits
Planning
Subsistence
Water
Zoning
Boards & Commissions
Coastal Management
Environmental Concerns
Fish & Game (both)
Government Organization
Hazardous Substances
Hearings
Land
Permits
Planning
Subsistence
Water
Zoning