AK SB39 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-25 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to elections; relating to voter registration; relating to ballots and a system of tracking and accounting for ballots; establishing an election offense hotline; designating as a class A misdemeanor the collection of ballots from other voters; designating as a class C felony the intentional opening or tampering with a sealed ballot, certificate, or package of ballots without authorization from the director of the division of elections; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ballot Custody/tampering; Voter Reg; Mail

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-25SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2022-04-25SenateFIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD
2022-04-25SenateFN6: ZERO(REV)
2022-04-25SenateFN5: ZERO(LAW)
2022-04-25SenateFN4: INDETERMINATE(GOV)
2022-04-25SenateAM: KIEHL
2022-04-25SenateDP: HOLLAND, HUGHES, SHOWER
2022-04-25SenateJUD RPT CS 3DP 1AM NEW TITLE
2022-04-19SenateJUD WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23
2021-05-07SenateFN3: (REV)
2021-05-07SenateFN2: ZERO(LAW)
2021-05-07SenateFN1: INDETERMINATE(GOV)
2021-05-07SenateAM: HOLLAND
2021-05-07SenateNR: COSTELLO, REINBOLD
2021-05-07SenateDNP: KAWASAKI
2021-05-07SenateDP: SHOWER
2021-05-07SenateSTA RPT CS 1DP 1DNP 2NR 1AM NEW TITLE
2021-04-21SenateSTA WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23
2021-01-25SenateSTA, JUD
2021-01-25SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-01-25SenatePREFILE RELEASED 1/15/21

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback