AK SB39 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-10 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on September 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-10 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act repealing the film production tax credit; providing for an effective date by repealing the effective dates of secs. 31 - 33, ch. 51, SLA 2012; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Repeal Film Production Tax Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSB 39(L&C)? Effective Dates (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-19 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-10 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2015-09-10 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/15 CHAPTER 35 SLA 15 |
2015-05-29 | Senate | 3:00 PM 5/28/15 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2015-04-19 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2015-04-19 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y16 N4 |
2015-04-19 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP |
2015-04-19 | House | VERSION: CSSB 39(L&C) AM H |
2015-04-19 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2015-04-19 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y27 N12 A1 |
2015-04-19 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y23 N16 A1 |
2015-04-19 | House | RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING |
2015-04-18 | House | MILLETT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2015-04-18 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y28 N12 |
2015-04-18 | House | PASSED Y23 N17 |
2015-04-18 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2015-04-18 | House | AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y28 N12 |
2015-04-18 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2015-04-18 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS UC |
2015-04-18 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 39(L&C) |
2015-04-17 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): STUTES |
2015-04-17 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/18 CALENDAR |
2015-04-17 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-04-17 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2015-04-17 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2015 |
2015-04-16 | House | FN1: INDETERMINATE(REV) |
2015-04-16 | House | NR: PRUITT, GARA, MUNOZ |
2015-04-16 | House | DP: SADDLER, WILSON, GATTIS, EDGMON, NEUMAN, THOMPSON |
2015-04-16 | House | FIN RPT 6DP 3NR |
2015-04-13 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILSON, GATTIS |
2015-04-13 | House | FIN |
2015-04-13 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2015-04-13 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 39(L&C) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2015-04-13 | Senate | PASSED Y14 N6 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2015-04-13 | Senate | AM NO 3 FAILED Y5 N15 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | AM NO 2 FAILED Y5 N15 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | AM NO 1 FAILED Y5 N15 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS UC |
2015-04-13 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 39(L&C) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/13 CALENDAR UC |
2015-04-10 | Senate | L&C CS ADOPTED UC |
2015-04-10 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-04-10 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/2015 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | FN1: INDETERMINATE(REV) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | NR: KELLY, BISHOP, HOFFMAN |
2015-04-09 | Senate | DNP: OLSON |
2015-04-09 | Senate | DP: MACKINNON, DUNLEAVY |
2015-04-09 | Senate | FIN RPT CS(L&C) 2DP 1DNP 3NR |
2015-03-13 | Senate | FN1: INDETERMINATE(REV) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | NR: MEYER, STEVENS |
2015-03-13 | Senate | DNP: ELLIS |
2015-03-13 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, GIESSEL |
2015-03-13 | Senate | L&C RPT CS 2DP 1DNP 2NR SAME TITLE |
2015-02-25 | Senate | MEYER |
2015-02-25 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): HUGGINS, MACKINNON, GIESSEL, BISHOP, MICCICHE, COGHILL, DUNLEAVY |
2015-02-04 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2015-02-04 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |