AK SB34 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to a demonstration state-tribal education compact; relating to demonstration state-tribal education compact schools; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State-tribal Education Compact Schools

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSB 34(JUD) Effective Date(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - House - House: Second Reading Adopt Tribal Affairs HCS (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Effective Date Clause(s) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-18SenateAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2022-05-18SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2022-05-18SenateCONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
2022-05-18SenateCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
2022-05-17HouseVERSION: HCS CSSB 34(TRB)
2022-05-17HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2022-05-17HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): WOOL
2022-05-17HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2022-05-17HousePASSED Y37 N2 E1
2022-05-17HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 34(TRB)
2022-05-16HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, SCHRAGE, STORY
2022-05-16HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/17 CALENDAR
2022-05-16HouseTRB HCS ADOPTED Y29 N8 A3
2022-05-16HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2022-05-16HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/16/2022
2022-05-11HouseFN1: ZERO(EED)
2022-05-11HouseNR: GILLHAM
2022-05-11HouseDP: CRONK, PRAX, ZULKOSKY, HOPKINS, STORY, DRUMMOND
2022-05-11HouseEDC RPT HCS(TRB) 6DP 1NR
2022-04-27HouseFN1: ZERO(EED)
2022-04-27HouseDP: ORTIZ, TARR, FIELDS, ZULKOSKY
2022-04-27HouseTRB RPT HCS(TRB) 4DP
2022-04-25HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): ZULKOSKY
2022-04-14HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): FIELDS
2022-04-05HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): FOSTER
2022-04-05HouseTRB, EDC
2022-04-05HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2022-04-04SenateVERSION: CSSB 34(JUD)
2022-04-04SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2022-04-04SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y14 N- E4 A2
2022-04-04SenatePASSED Y13 N1 E4 A2
2022-04-04SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 34(JUD)
2022-03-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/4 CAL
2022-03-30SenateJUD CS ADOPTED UC
2022-03-30SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2022-03-30SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 3/30/2022
2022-03-30SenateFN1: ZERO(EED)
2022-03-30SenateNR: HUGHES
2022-03-30SenateDP: HOLLAND, MYERS, KIEHL
2022-03-30SenateJUD RPT CS 3DP 1NR NEW TITLE
2022-03-23SenateFN1: ZERO(EED)
2022-03-18SenateDP: HOLLAND, MICCICHE, STEVENS, BEGICH
2022-03-18SenateEDC RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE
2021-01-25SenateEDC, JUD
2021-01-25SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-01-25SenatePREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/32?Root=SB34
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/SB0034A.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/SB0034B.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/SB0034C.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/SB0034D.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/SB0034Z.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=S&Bill=SB34&Page=02208#2208
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=S&Bill=SB34&Page=02209#2209
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SB34&Page=02948#2948
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SB34&Page=03007#3007
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SB34&Page=03008#3008
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=S&Bill=SB34&Page=02930#2930

Bill Comments

feedback