AK SB32 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - NOT TAKEN UP - ADJOURNED SINE DIE
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - NOT TAKEN UP - ADJOURNED SINE DIE
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing the Alaska middle college program for public school students; relating to the powers of the University of Alaska; relating to reporting requirements of the Board of Regents of the University of Alaska; and providing for an effective date.
Title
College Credit For High School Students
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | House | NOT TAKEN UP - ADJOURNED SINE DIE |
2022-05-18 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2022-05-17 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK, DRUMMOND, JOHNSON, MCCARTY, NELSON |
2022-05-17 | House | HELD IN SECOND READING TO 5/18 CALENDAR |
2022-05-17 | House | AM NO 6 OFFERED AND PENDING |
2022-05-17 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2022-05-17 | House | AM NO 5 ADOPTED Y37 E1 A2 |
2022-05-17 | House | AM NO 4 ADOPTED Y37 N1 E1 A1 |
2022-05-17 | House | AM 1 TO AM 4 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN |
2022-05-17 | House | AM NO 4 OFFERED |
2022-05-17 | House | AM NO 3 NOT OFFERED |
2022-05-17 | House | AM NO 2 TABLED UC |
2022-05-17 | House | AM NO 1 NOT OFFERED |
2022-05-17 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING |
2022-05-17 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2022-05-17 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-17 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE |
2022-02-04 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): STORY, KAUFMAN, TARR |
2022-02-04 | House | FN4: ZERO(UA) |
2022-02-04 | House | FN3: ZERO(EED) |
2022-02-04 | House | AM: EASTMAN |
2022-02-04 | House | DP: VANCE, TARR, CLAMAN, KAUFMAN, STORY, KREISS-TOMKINS |
2022-02-04 | House | STA RPT 6DP 1AM |
2021-05-15 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): VANCE |
2021-05-05 | House | FN2: ZERO(UA) |
2021-05-05 | House | FN1: ZERO(EED) |
2021-05-05 | House | NR: CRONK, GILLHAM, ZULKOSKY, PRAX |
2021-05-05 | House | DP: DRUMMOND, STORY |
2021-05-05 | House | EDC RPT 2DP 4NR |
2021-04-28 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): FIELDS |
2021-04-09 | House | EDC, STA |
2021-04-09 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-04-07 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 32(FIN) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2021-04-07 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-04-07 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2021-04-07 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 32(FIN) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, BEGICH, WIELECHOWSKI, REINBOLD, KAWASAKI |
2021-03-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/7 CALENDAR |
2021-03-31 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2021-03-31 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-03-31 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(UA) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(EED) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, WILSON, WIELECHOWSKI |
2021-03-29 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE |
2021-03-19 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(UA) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(EED) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | DP: HOLLAND, HUGHES, STEVENS, MICCICHE, BEGICH |
2021-03-19 | Senate | EDC RPT 5DP |
2021-03-10 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, GRAY-JACKSON |
2021-01-25 | Senate | EDC, FIN |
2021-01-25 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-01-25 | Senate | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21 |