AK SB32 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to biological products; relating to the practice of pharmacy; relating to the Board of Pharmacy; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescriptions For Biological Products

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to SB 32 Effective Dates (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-16SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
2018-07-16SenateSIGNED INTO LAW 7/13 CHAPTER 58 SLA 18
2018-07-10Senate11:17 AM 7/10/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-27HouseFN2: (CED)
2018-06-27HouseFN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 286
2018-06-27HouseLEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18
2018-06-27SenateLEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18
2018-04-30SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-04-30SenateCONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
2018-04-30SenateCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP UC
2018-04-27SenateHELD ON SECRETARY'S DESK
2018-04-27SenateCONCUR MESSAGE READ
2018-04-26HouseVERSION: HCS SB 32(FIN)
2018-04-26HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2018-04-26HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, SADDLER
2018-04-26HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-04-26HousePASSED Y35 E4 A1
2018-04-26HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 32(FIN)
2018-04-26HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-26HouseFIN HCS ADOPTED UC
2018-04-26HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-26HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/26/2018
2018-04-12HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): THOMPSON, WILSON, GARA
2018-04-12HouseFN2: (CED)
2018-04-12HouseAM: KAWASAKI
2018-04-12HouseNR: PRUITT, TILTON
2018-04-12HouseDP: WILSON, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, GRENN, GARA
2018-04-12HouseFIN RPT HCS(FIN) 6DP 2NR 1AM
2018-04-11HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): GRENN
2017-05-05HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
2017-04-14HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): EASTMAN
2017-04-14HouseFN1: (CED)
2017-04-14HouseNR: TARR, EDGMON
2017-04-14HouseDP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, KITO, EASTMAN, SPOHNHOLZ
2017-04-14HouseHSS RPT 4DP 2NR
2017-04-05HouseHSS, FIN
2017-04-05HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-04-04SenateVERSION: SB 32
2017-04-04SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2017-04-04SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2017-04-04SenatePASSED Y18 N2
2017-04-04SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 32
2017-04-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-04-04SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-04SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/2017
2017-04-03SenateFN1: (CED)
2017-04-03SenateAM: OLSON
2017-04-03SenateDP: VON IMHOF
2017-04-03SenateNR: MACKINNON, BISHOP, DUNLEAVY
2017-04-03SenateFIN RPT 1DP 3NR 1AM
2017-03-15SenateFIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C
2017-03-15SenateFN1: (CED)
2017-03-15SenateDP: COSTELLO, HUGHES, MEYER, STEVENS, GARDNER
2017-03-15SenateL&C RPT 5DP
2017-02-17SenateFN1: (CED)
2017-02-17SenateAM: GIESSEL
2017-02-17SenateDP: VON IMHOF, BEGICH
2017-02-17SenateNR: WILSON
2017-02-17SenateHSS RPT 2DP 1NR 1AM
2017-01-23SenateHSS, L&C
2017-01-23SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback