AK SB312 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/31/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/31/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the deposit of the proceeds of the tax on gambling operations aboard certain commercial passenger vessels into the general fund; providing for a reduction in the excise tax to $34.50 for a passenger for each voyage on a commercial passenger vessel; describing the passengers that are subject to the excise tax and liable for the payment of the tax; providing for a reduction in the state excise tax imposed on a passenger traveling on a commercial passenger vessel by the amount of tax on a passenger traveling on a commercial passenger vessel imposed by a municipality under a law enacted before December 17, 2007; authorizing appropriations from the commercial vessel passenger tax account to the first seven ports of call in the state and for costs associated with commercial passenger vessels and the passengers on board; limiting the use of funds appropriated from the commercial passenger vessel tax account to expenditures related to port facilities, harbor infrastructure, other services provided to the commercial passenger vessels and the passengers on board those vessels and certain other purposes; repealing the regional cruise ship impact fund; relating to the administration of the excise tax by the Department of Revenue and regulations required to be adopted; requiring a report from the Department of Commerce, Community, and Economic Development relating to safely and efficiently hosting passengers; defining 'voyage' for purposes of the excise tax; relating to municipal levies on a passenger on a commercial passenger vessel; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Vessel Passenger Tax
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/31/10 | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/24 CHAPTER 101 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | MANIFEST ERROR(S) | |
2010-07-09 | 2:55 PM 6/14/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-07-09 | ENGROSSED AND RETURNED TO SENATE 4/22 | |
2010-04-18 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-18 | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y17 N3 | |
2010-04-18 | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP | |
2010-04-18 | VERSION: CSSB 312(FIN) AM H | |
2010-04-18 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED | |
2010-04-18 | ENGROSSMENT WAIVED, RULE 43(B) | |
2010-04-18 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-18 | PASSED Y27 N13 | |
2010-04-18 | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING | |
2010-04-18 | AM NO 5 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-18 | AM NO 4 FAILED Y15 N25 | |
2010-04-18 | RESCIND ACTION FAILING AM 4 UC | |
2010-04-18 | NEW AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-18 | AM NO 2 WITHDRAWN | |
2010-04-18 | RESCIND ACTION ADOPTING AM 2 UC | |
2010-04-18 | AM NO 4 FAILED Y20 N20 | |
2010-04-18 | AM NO 3 FAILED Y6 N34 | |
2010-04-18 | AM NO 2 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-18 | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-18 | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 AND ALL AMS UC | |
2010-04-18 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 312(FIN) | |
2010-04-17 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/18 CALENDAR | |
2010-04-17 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-17 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2010 | |
2010-04-17 | FN3: (REV) | |
2010-04-17 | FN2: (CED) | |
2010-04-17 | NR: THOMAS, GARA, DOOGAN, JOULE, N.FOSTER, FAIRCLOUGH, STOLTZE | |
2010-04-17 | DP: AUSTERMAN, KELLY, HAWKER | |
2010-04-17 | TITLE CHANGE: HCR 32 | |
2010-04-17 | FIN RPT HCS(FIN) NT 3DP 7NR | |
2010-04-14 | FIN | |
2010-04-14 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-04-14 | VERSION: CSSB 312(FIN) | |
2010-04-14 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2010-04-14 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-14 | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y17 N3 | |
2010-04-14 | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-14 | ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION | |
2010-04-14 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-14 | PASSED Y16 N3 A1 | |
2010-04-14 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 312(FIN) | |
2010-04-14 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-14 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-14 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-14 | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR | |
2010-04-14 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | FN2: (CED) | |
2010-04-14 | FN1: (REV) | |
2010-04-14 | NR: HUGGINS, THOMAS, EGAN, ELLIS, OLSON | |
2010-04-14 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN | |
2010-04-14 | FIN RPT CS 2DP 5NR NEW TITLE | |
2010-03-30 | FIN | |
2010-03-30 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |