AK SB303 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-15 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-15 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to a subcontractor's, contractor's, and project owner's liability for workers' compensation and excluding certain persons from liability for securing the payment of workers' compensation benefits to employees; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Workers' Comp; Contractors & Others
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY | |
2010-04-15 | JUD REFERRAL ADDED | |
2010-04-15 | L&C REFERRAL WAIVED | |
2010-04-13 | L&C | |
2010-04-13 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-04-13 | VERSION: 2D CSSB 303(RLS) | |
2010-04-13 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2010-04-13 | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP | |
2010-04-12 | BUNDE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION | |
2010-04-12 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-12 | PASSED Y19 N1 | |
2010-04-12 | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING 2D CSSB 303(RLS) | |
2010-04-12 | RLS 2D CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-12 | WITHDRAW MOTION TO ADOPT JUD CS UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-12 | RESCIND ACTION ADOPTING JUD CS UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-12 | RET 2ND/RESCIND ACTION ADOPTING JUD CS UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-12 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 303(JUD) | |
2010-04-12 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2010 | |
2010-04-12 | FN1: ZERO(LWF) | |
2010-04-12 | NR: HUGGINS, STEDMAN, STEVENS | |
2010-04-12 | DP: ELLIS | |
2010-04-12 | RLS RPT 2D CS 1DP 3NR NEW TITLE | |
2010-04-10 | RULES WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23 | |
2010-04-10 | RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE | |
2010-04-09 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/10 CALENDAR | |
2010-04-09 | JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-09 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-09 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | FN1: ZERO(LWF) | |
2010-04-07 | NR: COGHILL | |
2010-04-07 | DP: FRENCH, WIELECHOWSKI | |
2010-04-07 | JUD RPT CS 2DP 1NR NEW TITLE | |
2010-04-02 | FN1: ZERO(LWF) | |
2010-04-02 | NR: MEYER | |
2010-04-02 | DP: PASKVAN, DAVIS, THOMAS | |
2010-04-02 | L&C RPT 3DP 1NR | |
2010-03-08 | L&C, JUD | |
2010-03-08 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |