AK SB3006 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-14 - SESSION CANCELED 9/14
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-14 - SESSION CANCELED 9/14
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the right of patients to have a support person present during treatment and during stays at certain facilities; relating to utilization review requirements; making temporary changes to state law in response to the novel coronavirus disease; relating to telemedicine and telehealth; relating to background checks; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Health Care Reqs; Covid-19; Telehealth
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-12 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 18 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-09-12 - House - House: Return to Rules Committee (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-12 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-12 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 15 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-09-12 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 17 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-09-12 - House - House: Second Reading Adopt (Y: 19 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Updated Amendment No. 1 (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Effective Date Clause(s) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - On Reconsideration (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 10 (Y: 8 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 9 (Y: 7 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 9 (Y: 7 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 6 (Y: 3 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 6 (Y: 3 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 8 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-09-12 - House - House: Return to Rules Committee (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-12 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-12 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 15 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-09-12 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 17 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-09-12 - House - House: Second Reading Adopt (Y: 19 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Updated Amendment No. 1 (Y: 10 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Effective Date Clause(s) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - On Reconsideration (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 10 (Y: 8 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 9 (Y: 7 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 9 (Y: 7 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 6 (Y: 3 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 6 (Y: 3 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 9 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 8 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-14 | House | SESSION CANCELED 9/14 |
2021-09-13 | House | SESSION CANCELED 9/13 |
2021-09-13 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 9/13/2021 |
2021-09-12 | House | RETURNED TO RULES COMMITTEE Y20 N16 E3 A1 |
2021-09-12 | House | AM NO 5 FAILED Y18 N18 E3 A1 |
2021-09-12 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2021-09-12 | House | AM NO 4 ADOPTED Y20 N16 E3 A1 |
2021-09-12 | House | AM NO 4 OFFERED AND PENDING |
2021-09-12 | House | AM NO 3 NOT OFFERED |
2021-09-12 | House | AM NO 2 FAILED Y15 N21 E3 A1 |
2021-09-12 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y17 N19 E3 A1 |
2021-09-12 | House | HSS HCS ADOPTED Y19 N17 E3 A1 |
2021-09-12 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-09-12 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 9/12/2021 |
2021-09-12 | House | FN5: ZERO(DPS) |
2021-09-12 | House | FN4: ZERO(DHS) |
2021-09-12 | House | FN3: ZERO(CED) |
2021-09-12 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2021-09-12 | House | AM: KURKA |
2021-09-12 | House | DP: FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ, MCCARTY, PRAX, SNYDER, ZULKOSKY |
2021-09-12 | House | TITLE CHANGE: HCR 301 |
2021-09-12 | House | HSS RPT HCS(HSS) NEW TITLE 6DP 1AM |
2021-09-11 | House | HSS |
2021-09-11 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-09-10 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 3006(L&C) AM |
2021-09-10 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2021-09-10 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y16 N- E3 A1 |
2021-09-10 | Senate | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y13 N3 E3 A1 |
2021-09-10 | Senate | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2021-09-10 | Senate | HOFFMAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2021-09-10 | Senate | FAILED PASSAGE Y9 N8 E3 |
2021-09-10 | Senate | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2021-09-10 | Senate | AM NO 10 FAILED Y8 N9 E3 |
2021-09-10 | Senate | AM NO 9 FAILED Y7 N10 E3 |
2021-09-10 | Senate | AM NO 8 NOT OFFERED |
2021-09-10 | Senate | AM NO 7 OFFERED AND TABLED Y11 N6 E3 |
2021-09-10 | Senate | AM NO 6 FAILED Y3 N14 E3 |
2021-09-10 | Senate | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2021-09-10 | Senate | AM NO 5 ADOPTED Y9 N8 E3 |
2021-09-10 | Senate | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2021-09-10 | Senate | AM NO 4 ADOPTED Y9 N8 E3 |
2021-09-10 | Senate | AM NO 3 FAILED Y8 N9 E3 |
2021-09-10 | Senate | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2021-09-10 | Senate | AM NO 2 ADOPTED UC |
2021-09-10 | Senate | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2021-09-10 | Senate | UPDATED AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y10 N7 E2 A1 |
2021-09-10 | Senate | AM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN - UPDATED AM NO 1 OFFERED |
2021-09-10 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AMENDMENTS UC |
2021-09-10 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 3006(L&C) |
2021-09-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 9/10 CALENDAR |
2021-09-09 | Senate | L&C CS ADOPTED UC |
2021-09-09 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-09-09 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 9/9/2021 |
2021-09-09 | Senate | FN5: ZERO(DPS) |
2021-09-09 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(DHS) |
2021-09-09 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(CED) |
2021-09-09 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2021-09-09 | Senate | DP: REVAK, MICCICHE |
2021-09-09 | Senate | NR: COSTELLO |
2021-09-09 | Senate | L&C RPT CS 2DP 1NR NEW TITLE |
2021-09-02 | Senate | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2021-09-02 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(CED) |
2021-09-02 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DHS) |
2021-09-02 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2021-09-02 | Senate | L&C |
2021-09-02 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Disaster
Health & Social Services
Hospitals
Insurance
Licensing
Medical Care
Nurses
Occupations & Professions
Physicians
Residential Care
Health & Social Services
Hospitals
Insurance
Licensing
Medical Care
Nurses
Occupations & Professions
Physicians
Residential Care