AK SB292 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the registration and operation of pawnbrokers, to the exemption for pawnbrokers under the Alaska Small Loans Act, and to the exclusion of pawnbrokers under certain definitions in the Uniform Commercial Code; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Pawnbrokers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/4 CHAPTER 49 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | MANIFEST ERROR(S) | |
2010-07-09 | 1:28 PM 6/1/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-18 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-18 | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N1 | |
2010-04-18 | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP | |
2010-04-18 | VERSION: HCS CSSB 292(FIN) AM H | |
2010-04-18 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED | |
2010-04-18 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-18 | PASSED Y39 A1 | |
2010-04-18 | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING | |
2010-04-18 | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-18 | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-18 | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 292(FIN) | |
2010-04-18 | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR | |
2010-04-18 | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR | |
2010-04-18 | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR | |
2010-04-17 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/18 CALENDAR | |
2010-04-17 | FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-17 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-17 | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/17/2010 | |
2010-04-16 | FN1: (CED) | |
2010-04-16 | NR: DOOGAN, AUSTERMAN, KELLY, STOLTZE, HAWKER | |
2010-04-16 | DP: THOMAS, GARA, FAIRCLOUGH, SALMON, JOULE | |
2010-04-16 | FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 5DP 5NR | |
2010-04-14 | FIN | |
2010-04-14 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-04-14 | VERSION: CSSB 292(JUD) | |
2010-04-14 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2010-04-14 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-14 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2010-04-14 | COSPONSOR(S): DYSON | |
2010-04-14 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 292(JUD) | |
2010-04-14 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-14 | JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-14 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-14 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2010 | |
2010-04-10 | FN1: (CED) | |
2010-04-10 | NR: OLSON, ELLIS | |
2010-04-10 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN | |
2010-04-10 | FIN RPT CS(JUD) 4DP 2NR | |
2010-04-06 | FN1: (CED) | |
2010-04-06 | NR: COGHILL | |
2010-04-06 | DP: FRENCH, WIELECHOWSKI | |
2010-04-06 | JUD RPT CS 2DP 1NR NEW TITLE | |
2010-04-01 | COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, MENARD | |
2010-03-22 | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD | |
2010-03-22 | FN1: (CED) | |
2010-03-22 | DP: PASKVAN, DAVIS, BUNDE | |
2010-03-22 | L&C RPT CS 3DP NEW TITLE | |
2010-02-24 | L&C, JUD | |
2010-02-24 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Boards & Commissions
Business
Claims
Crimes
Debt
Fees
Law Enforcement
Licensing
Loans
Occupations & Professions
Property
Sales
Business
Claims
Crimes
Debt
Fees
Law Enforcement
Licensing
Loans
Occupations & Professions
Property
Sales