AK SB29 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/17/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Extend Board Of Marine Pilots

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extend Board Of Marine Pilots

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-16SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/17/19
2019-08-16SenateSIGNED INTO LAW 8/16 CHAPTER 23 SLA 19
2019-08-13Senate11:31 AM 8/13/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2019-05-14HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, WOOL
2019-05-14HouseVERSION: SB 29
2019-05-14HouseRETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2019-05-14HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2019-05-14HousePASSED Y35 N1 A4
2019-05-14HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 29
2019-05-14HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-05-14HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-05-13HouseHELD TO 5/14 CALENDAR
2019-05-13HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/2019
2019-05-09HouseFN2: (CED)
2019-05-09HouseNR: CARPENTER, TILTON, MERRICK
2019-05-09HouseDP: JOHNSTON, LEBON, KNOPP, JOSEPHSON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, ORTIZ, WILSON
2019-05-09HouseFIN RPT 7DP 3NR
2019-04-26HouseFN1: (CED)
2019-04-26HouseDP: HANNAN, STUTES, TALERICO, FIELDS, LEDOUX, WOOL
2019-04-26HouseL&C RPT 6DP
2019-04-08HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK
2019-04-08HouseL&C, FIN
2019-04-08HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-04-05SenateVERSION: SB 29
2019-04-05SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2019-04-05SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2019-04-05SenatePASSED Y18 N- E2
2019-04-05SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 29
2019-04-03SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/5 CALENDAR
2019-04-03SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-04-03SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/3/2019
2019-03-08SenateFN1: (CED)
2019-03-08SenateNR: SHOWER
2019-03-08SenateDP: STEDMAN, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE, HOFFMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, WILSON, BISHOP
2019-03-08SenateFIN RPT 8DP 1NR
2019-02-08SenateFN1: (CED)
2019-02-08SenateDP: REINBOLD, BIRCH, BISHOP, COSTELLO, GRAY-JACKSON
2019-02-08SenateL&C RPT 5DP
2019-01-23SenateL&C, FIN
2019-01-23SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback