AK SB284 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/2/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/2/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to state election campaigns, the duties of the Alaska Public Offices Commission, the reporting and disclosure of expenditures and independent expenditures, the filing of reports, and the identification of certain communications in state election campaigns; prohibiting expenditures and contributions by foreign nationals in state elections; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Campaign Expenditures
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/2/10 | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/1 CHAPTER 36 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | MANIFEST ERROR(S) | |
2010-07-09 | 3:04 PM 5/27/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-07-09 | ENGROSSED AND RETURNED TO SENATE 4/22 | |
2010-04-18 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-18 | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N- | |
2010-04-18 | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP | |
2010-04-18 | VERSION: HCS CSSB 284(FIN) AM H | |
2010-04-18 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED | |
2010-04-18 | ENGROSSMENT WAIVED, RULE 43(B) | |
2010-04-18 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-18 | PASSED Y40 | |
2010-04-18 | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 284(FIN) AM H | |
2010-04-18 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-18 | AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y23 N17 | |
2010-04-18 | FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-18 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-18 | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR | |
2010-04-18 | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR | |
2010-04-18 | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR | |
2010-04-18 | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR | |
2010-04-18 | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR | |
2010-04-18 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2010 | |
2010-04-17 | FN2: (ADM) | |
2010-04-17 | FN1: ZERO(GOV) | |
2010-04-17 | AM: GARA, DOOGAN, JOULE, N.FOSTER | |
2010-04-17 | NR: AUSTERMAN, SALMON, KELLY, STOLTZE, HAWKER | |
2010-04-17 | DP: THOMAS, FAIRCLOUGH | |
2010-04-17 | FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 2DP 5NR 4AM | |
2010-04-13 | HCS(JUD) RECEIVED | |
2010-04-12 | FN2: (ADM) | |
2010-04-12 | FN1: ZERO(GOV) | |
2010-04-12 | NR: HERRON, DAHLSTROM, GATTO, RAMRAS | |
2010-04-12 | DP: LYNN, HOLMES | |
2010-04-12 | JUD RPT HCS(JUD) 2DP 4NR (HCS FORTHCOMING) | |
2010-04-05 | JUD, FIN | |
2010-04-05 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-04-01 | VERSION: CSSB 284(FIN) | |
2010-04-01 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2010-04-01 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-01 | PASSED Y19 N- E1 | |
2010-04-01 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 284(FIN) | |
2010-04-01 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-01 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-01 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-01 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/1/2010 | |
2010-03-29 | FN2: (ADM) | |
2010-03-29 | FN1: ZERO(GOV) | |
2010-03-29 | NR: HUGGINS | |
2010-03-29 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN | |
2010-03-29 | FIN RPT CS 4DP 1NR NEW TITLE | |
2010-03-18 | FN2: (ADM) | |
2010-03-18 | FN1: ZERO(GOV) | |
2010-03-18 | AM: COGHILL | |
2010-03-18 | DP: FRENCH, WIELECHOWSKI, MCGUIRE | |
2010-03-18 | JUD RPT CS 3DP 1AM NEW TITLE | |
2010-03-02 | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD | |
2010-03-02 | FN2: (ADM) | |
2010-03-02 | FN1: ZERO(GOV) | |
2010-03-02 | DP: MENARD, FRENCH, MEYER, PASKVAN, KOOKESH | |
2010-03-02 | STA RPT 5DP | |
2010-02-19 | STA, JUD | |
2010-02-19 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Advertising
Aliens
Boards & Commissions
Campaigns
Communications
Corporations
Crimes
Disclosure
Elections
Gambling
Labor Unions
Media
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Records
Aliens
Boards & Commissions
Campaigns
Communications
Corporations
Crimes
Disclosure
Elections
Gambling
Labor Unions
Media
Nonprofit Organizations
Public Records