AK SB28 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 19 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-08-30 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/5/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act establishing April 24 of each year as Vic Fischer and Jack Coghill Constitution of the State of Alaska Day; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Est. April 24 Alaska Constitution Day

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment(s) Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 43 (Y: 12 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 43 (Y: 12 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Sustain Ruling of the Chair/Amendment No. 42 Ruled Out of Order (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Sustain Ruling of the Chair/Amendment No. 8 Ruled Out of Order (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Sustain Ruling of the Chair/Amendment No. 4 Ruled Out of Order (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-15 - House - House: Second Reading Sustain Ruling of the Chair/Amendment No. 3 Ruled Out of Order (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 15 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-30SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/5/21
2021-08-30SenateLAW W/O GOV SIGNATURE 8/30 CH 33 SLA 21
2021-08-19Senate12:45 P.M. 8/18/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2021-05-18SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2021-05-18SenateCONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- A1
2021-05-17HouseVERSION: HCS CSSB 28(STA)
2021-05-17HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2021-05-17HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y36 N4
2021-05-17HousePASSED Y24 N16
2021-05-17HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 28(STA)
2021-05-15HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK
2021-05-15HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/17 CALENDAR
2021-05-15HouseAM NO 47 FAILED Y12 N25 E3
2021-05-15HouseAMS NOS 44 - 46 NOT OFFERED
2021-05-15HouseAM NO 43 FAILED Y12 N25 E3
2021-05-15HouseSUSTAINED RULING OF CHAIR Y23 N13 E3 A1
2021-05-15HouseAM NO 42 RULED OUT OF ORDER
2021-05-15HouseAMS NOS 9 - 41 NOT OFFERED
2021-05-15HouseSUSTAINED RULING OF CHAIR Y29 N6 E3 A2
2021-05-15HouseAM NO 8 RULED OUT OF ORDER
2021-05-15HouseAM NO 7 RULED OUT OF ORDER UC
2021-05-15HouseAM NO 6 RULED OUT OF ORDER UC
2021-05-15HouseAM NO 5 RULED OUT OF ORDER UC
2021-05-15HouseSUSTAINED RULING OF CHAIR Y26 N11 E3
2021-05-15HouseAM NO 4 RULED OUT OF ORDER
2021-05-15HouseSUSTAINED RULING OF CHAIR Y21 N15 E3 A1
2021-05-15HouseAM NO 3 RULED OUT OF ORDER
2021-05-15HouseAM NO 2 NOT OFFERED
2021-05-15HouseBEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING
2021-05-14HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
2021-05-14HouseHELD IN SECOND READING TO 5/15 CALENDAR
2021-05-14HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y15 N24 E1
2021-05-14HouseSTA HCS ADOPTED UC
2021-05-14HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2021-05-14HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2021
2021-05-06HouseFN3: ZERO(GOV/VARIOUS DEPTS)
2021-05-06HouseFN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
2021-05-06HouseNR: EASTMAN, VANCE
2021-05-06HouseDP: CLAMAN, STORY, KAUFMAN, TARR, KREISS-TOMKINS
2021-05-06HouseSTA RPT HCS(STA) 5DP 2NR
2021-04-26HouseSTA
2021-04-26HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-04-23SenateVERSION: CSSB 28(STA)
2021-04-23SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2021-04-23SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2021-04-23SenatePASSED Y15 N- E5
2021-04-23SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 28(STA)
2021-04-23SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2021-04-23SenateSTA CS ADOPTED UC
2021-04-23SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2021-04-23SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/23/2021
2021-04-23SenateFN2: INDETERMINATE(GOV/VARIOUS)
2021-04-23SenateFN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED)
2021-04-23SenateAM: COSTELLO
2021-04-23SenateDP: HOLLAND, KAWASAKI
2021-04-23SenateNR: SHOWER
2021-04-23SenateSTA RPT CS 2DP 1NR 1AM SAME TITLE
2021-01-22SenateSTA
2021-01-22SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-01-22SenatePREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/32?Root=SB28
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/SB0028A.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/SB0028B.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/SB0028C.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/SB0028Z.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=S&Bill=SB28&Page=00795#0795
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SB28&Page=01101#1101
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SB28&Page=01102#1102
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SB28&Page=01105#1105
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SB28&Page=01106#1106
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SB28&Page=01132#1132
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SB28&Page=01133#1133
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=S&Bill=SB28&Page=01103#1103
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SB28&Page=01084#AM1
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SB28&Page=01106#AM43
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=SB28&Page=01107#AM47

Bill Comments

feedback