AK SB279 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to regulation of residential mortgage lending, including the licensing of mortgage lenders, mortgage brokers, and mortgage loan originators, and compliance with certain federal laws relating to residential mortgage lending; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Mortgage Lending
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Paskvan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/9 CHAPTER 61 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | 2:50 PM 6/7/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-17 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-17 | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- A1 | |
2010-04-17 | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP | |
2010-04-16 | VERSION: HCS CSSB 279(FIN) | |
2010-04-16 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED | |
2010-04-16 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KERTTULA | |
2010-04-16 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-16 | PASSED Y27 E1 A12 | |
2010-04-16 | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 279(FIN) | |
2010-04-16 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-16 | FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-16 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-16 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2010 | |
2010-04-16 | FN1: (CED) | |
2010-04-16 | NR: AUSTERMAN | |
2010-04-16 | DP: THOMAS, GARA, DOOGAN, JOULE, N.FOSTER, FAIRCLOUGH, SALMON, STOLTZE, HAWKER | |
2010-04-16 | FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 9DP 1NR | |
2010-04-15 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): FAIRCLOUGH | |
2010-04-10 | FN1: (CED) | |
2010-04-10 | AM: BUCH | |
2010-04-10 | NR: T.WILSON, HOLMES, CHENAULT | |
2010-04-10 | DP: LYNN, OLSON | |
2010-04-10 | L&C RPT HCS(L&C) 2DP 3NR 1AM | |
2010-04-05 | L&C, FIN | |
2010-04-05 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-04-02 | VERSION: CSSB 279(FIN) | |
2010-04-02 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2010-04-02 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-02 | PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1 | |
2010-04-02 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 279(FIN) | |
2010-04-02 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-02 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-02 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-02 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/2/2010 | |
2010-03-29 | FN1: (CED) | |
2010-03-29 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN | |
2010-03-29 | FIN RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE | |
2010-03-04 | FN1: (CED) | |
2010-03-04 | DP: PASKVAN, MEYER, DAVIS | |
2010-03-04 | L&C RPT 3DP | |
2010-02-15 | L&C, FIN | |
2010-02-15 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Administrative Procedure
Consumer Affairs
Crimes
Financial Institutions
Funds
Hearings
Housing
Intergovernmental Relations
Land
Licensing
Loans
Occupations & Professions
Public Records
Trade Practices
Consumer Affairs
Crimes
Financial Institutions
Funds
Hearings
Housing
Intergovernmental Relations
Land
Licensing
Loans
Occupations & Professions
Public Records
Trade Practices