AK SB277 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/31/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/31/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act exempting from regulation by the Regulatory Commission of Alaska and by municipalities certain generators of electricity from renewable energy resources that sell electricity to regulated utilities.
Title
Pub. Utility Exemption: Renewable Energy
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/31/10 | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/2 CHAPTER 37 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | MANIFEST ERROR(S) | |
2010-07-09 | 2:15 PM 5/27/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-17 | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y18 N1 A1 | |
2010-04-17 | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP | |
2010-04-16 | VERSION: HCS CSSB 277(L&C) | |
2010-04-16 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED | |
2010-04-16 | PASSED Y28 E1 A11 | |
2010-04-16 | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 277(L&C) | |
2010-04-16 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-16 | L&C HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-16 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-16 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2010 | |
2010-04-16 | FN1: ZERO(CED) | |
2010-04-16 | DP: LYNN, BUCH, NEUMAN, HOLMES, T.WILSON, OLSON | |
2010-04-16 | L&C RPT HCS(L&C) 6DP | |
2010-04-10 | RES REFERRAL WAIVED | |
2010-04-09 | ENE REFERRAL WAIVED | |
2010-04-05 | ENE, RES, L&C | |
2010-04-05 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-04-02 | VERSION: CSSB 277(RES) AM | |
2010-04-02 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2010-04-02 | PASSED Y18 N1 E1 | |
2010-04-02 | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING | |
2010-04-02 | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-02 | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-02 | BEFORE THE SENATE IN THIRD READING | |
2010-03-29 | HELD IN THIRD READING TO 4/2 CALENDAR | |
2010-03-29 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 277(RES) | |
2010-03-26 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/29 CALENDAR | |
2010-03-26 | RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-26 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-26 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/26/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | FN1: ZERO(CED) | |
2010-03-25 | NR: FRENCH, WIELECHOWSKI, EGAN | |
2010-03-25 | DP: MCGUIRE | |
2010-03-25 | JUD RPT CS(RES) 1DP 3NR | |
2010-03-02 | FN1: ZERO(CED) | |
2010-03-02 | NR: WIELECHOWSKI, STEVENS, FRENCH | |
2010-03-02 | DP: MCGUIRE | |
2010-03-02 | RES RPT CS 1DP 3NR NEW TITLE | |
2010-02-12 | RES, JUD | |
2010-02-12 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |