AK SB26 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, HUGHES, REINBOLD, HOLLAND, SHOWER
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, HUGHES, REINBOLD, HOLLAND, SHOWER
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act repealing the certificate of need program for health care facilities; making conforming amendments; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Repeal Certificate Of Need Program
Sponsors
Sen. David Wilson [R] | Sen. Mia Costello [R] | Sen. Shelley Hughes [R] | Sen. Lora Reinbold [R] |
Sen. Roger Holland [R] | Sen. Mike Shower [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, HUGHES, REINBOLD, HOLLAND, SHOWER |
2022-02-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2022-02-22 | Senate | FIN REFERRAL ADDED |
2022-02-18 | Senate | FN4: INDETERMINATE(DHS) |
2022-02-18 | Senate | FN3: (DHS) |
2022-02-18 | Senate | NR: STEVENS, MICCICHE, REVAK |
2022-02-18 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO |
2022-02-18 | Senate | L&C RPT CS 1DP 3NR SAME TITLE |
2021-04-09 | Senate | FN2: INDETERMINATE(DHS) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | FN1: (DHS) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | NR: BEGICH, REINBOLD, COSTELLO |
2021-04-09 | Senate | DP: HUGHES |
2021-04-09 | Senate | HSS RPT 1DP 3NR |
2021-01-22 | Senate | HSS, L&C |
2021-01-22 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-01-22 | Senate | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21 |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/32?Root=SB26 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/SB0026A.PDF |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/SB0026B.PDF |