AK SB26 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - FIRST SPECIAL SESSION BILL
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to an appropriation limit; relating to the budget responsibilities of the governor; relating to the Alaska permanent fund, the earnings of the Alaska permanent fund, and the earnings reserve account; relating to the mental health trust fund; relating to deposits into the dividend fund; and relating to the calculation and payment of permanent fund dividends.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Approp Limit & Per Fund:dividend;earnings

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2017-04-16 - House - House: Recede (Y: 17 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-04-16 - House - House: Recede (Y: 17 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendments to CSSB 26(FIN) (Y: 4 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Effective Date Clauses (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - On Reconsideration (Y: 12 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Take up Reconsideration Same Day (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Effective Date Clauses (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: CSSB 26(FIN) Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 7 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 8 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Lay Amendment No. 1 on the Table (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Lay Amendment No. 1 on the Table (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18HouseFIRST SPECIAL SESSION BILL
2017-05-18SenateFIRST SPECIAL SESSION BILL
2017-04-26SenateMACKINNON (CHAIR), HOFFMAN, EGAN
2017-04-26SenateCONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
2017-04-26HouseFOSTER (CHAIR), SEATON, THOMPSON
2017-04-26HouseCONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
2017-04-24HouseAPPOINT CONFERENCE COMTE MOTION WITHDRAWN
2017-04-16HouseFAILED RECEDE (H) AM Y17 N22 E1
2017-04-16HouseRECEDE MESSAGE TAKEN UP UC
2017-04-15HouseRECEDE MESSAGE READ AND HELD
2017-04-14SenateFAILED CONCUR (H) AM Y4 N16
2017-04-14SenateCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
2017-04-13SenateCONCUR MESSAGE READ
2017-04-12HouseVERSION: HCS CSSB 26(FIN)(EFD FLD H)
2017-04-12HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2017-04-12House...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2017-04-12HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y22 N18
2017-04-12HousePASSED Y22 N18
2017-04-12HouseBEFORE HOUSE IN THIRD READING
2017-04-12HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 26(FIN)
2017-04-12HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-04-12HouseFIN HCS ADOPTED UC
2017-04-12HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-12HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2017
2017-04-12HouseFN14: (REV/VARIOUS DEPTS)
2017-04-12HouseFN13: (REV/FUND TRANSFERS)
2017-04-12HouseFN12: (REV)
2017-04-12HouseFN11: (REV)
2017-04-12HouseFN10: (COR)
2017-04-12HouseFN4: ZERO(REV)
2017-04-12HouseNR: ORTIZ
2017-04-12HouseDNP: THOMPSON, TILTON, WILSON, PRUITT
2017-04-12HouseDP: GARA, KAWASAKI, GUTTENBERG, GRENN, SEATON, FOSTER
2017-04-12HouseFIN RPT HCS(FIN) 6DP 4DNP 1NR
2017-03-16HouseFIN
2017-03-16HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-03-15SenateVERSION: CSSB 26(FIN)
2017-03-15SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2017-03-15SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y15 N5
2017-03-15SenatePASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y12 N8
2017-03-15SenateRECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY Y15 N5
2017-03-15SenateMICCICHE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2017-03-15SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y16 N4
2017-03-15SenatePASSED Y13 N7
2017-03-15SenateAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2017-03-15SenateAM NO 4 FAILED Y7 N13
2017-03-15SenateAM NO 3 FAILED Y7 N13
2017-03-15SenateAM NO 2 FAILED Y8 N12
2017-03-15SenateAM NO 1 TABLED Y16 N4
2017-03-15SenateRETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMENDMENTS UC
2017-03-15SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 26(FIN)
2017-03-13SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/15 CALENDAR
2017-03-13SenateFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2017-03-13SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-03-13SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 3/13/2017
2017-03-13SenateFN9: (REV)
2017-03-13SenateFN8: (REV)
2017-03-13SenateFN7: (COR)
2017-03-13SenateFN5: ZERO(ADM)
2017-03-13SenateFN4: ZERO(REV)
2017-03-13SenateFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2017-03-13SenateDNP: DUNLEAVY, OLSON
2017-03-13SenateDP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE
2017-03-13SenateFIN RPT CS 5DP 2DNP NEW TITLE
2017-03-03SenateFN6: (REV)
2017-03-03SenateFN5: ZERO(ADM)
2017-03-03SenateFN4: ZERO(REV)
2017-03-03SenateFN3: (REV)
2017-03-03SenateFN2: (COR)
2017-03-03SenateFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2017-03-03SenateAM: GIESSEL
2017-03-03SenateNR: EGAN, COGHILL
2017-03-03SenateDNP: DUNLEAVY, WILSON
2017-03-03SenateSTA RPT 2DNP 2NR 1AM
2017-01-18SenateGOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
2017-01-18SenateFN6: (REV)
2017-01-18SenateFN5: ZERO(ADM)
2017-01-18SenateFN4: ZERO(REV)
2017-01-18SenateFN3: (REV)
2017-01-18SenateFN2: (COR)
2017-01-18SenateFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2017-01-18SenateSTA, FIN
2017-01-18SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/30?Root=SB26
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_fulltext.asp?session=30&bill=SB26
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/SB0026A.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/SB0026B.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/SB0026C.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/SB0026D.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB26&jrn=0524&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB26&jrn=0526&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB26&jrn=0528&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB26&jrn=0530&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB26&jrn=0539&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB26&jrn=1065&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB26&jrn=0956&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB26&jrn=1142&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB26&jrn=0540&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB26&jrn=1143&hse=H

Bill Comments

feedback