AK SB257 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/26/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/26/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to funding for youth courts; and relating to accounting for criminal fines.
Title
Youth Courts And Criminal Fines
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/26/10 | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/28 CHAPTER 110 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | 2:55 PM 6/14/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-17 | VERSION: SB 257 | |
2010-04-17 | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-17 | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP | |
2010-04-16 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HERRON, KAWASAKI, GARDNER | |
2010-04-16 | JOHANSEN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION | |
2010-04-16 | PASSED Y29 E1 A10 | |
2010-04-16 | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 257 | |
2010-04-16 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-16 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-16 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2010 | |
2010-04-09 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): N.FOSTER, JOULE, THOMAS, STOLTZE | |
2010-04-09 | FN3: ZERO(LAW) | |
2010-04-09 | FN2: ZERO(DHS) | |
2010-04-09 | FN1: ZERO(CRT) | |
2010-04-09 | NR: AUSTERMAN | |
2010-04-09 | DP: GARA, DOOGAN, THOMAS, JOULE, N.FOSTER, SALMON, STOLTZE, HAWKER | |
2010-04-09 | FIN RPT 8DP 1NR | |
2010-03-25 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MUNOZ, TUCK, KERTTULA | |
2010-03-25 | FIN | |
2010-03-25 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-03-24 | VERSION: SB 257 | |
2010-03-24 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2010-03-24 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2010-03-24 | STEVENS | |
2010-03-24 | COSPONSOR(S): PASKVAN, WIELECHOWSKI, THOMAS, DYSON, KOOKESH, WAGONER, MEYER, | |
2010-03-24 | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 257 | |
2010-03-24 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-24 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-24 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/24/2010 | |
2010-03-22 | FN3: ZERO(LAW) | |
2010-03-22 | FN2: ZERO(DHS) | |
2010-03-22 | FN1: ZERO(CRT) | |
2010-03-22 | NR: HOFFMAN, OLSON | |
2010-03-22 | DP: STEDMAN, HUGGINS, EGAN | |
2010-03-22 | FIN RPT 3DP 2NR | |
2010-02-26 | COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE | |
2010-02-26 | FN3: ZERO(LAW) | |
2010-02-26 | FN2: ZERO(DHS) | |
2010-02-26 | FN1: ZERO(CRT) | |
2010-02-26 | NR: COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI | |
2010-02-26 | DP: FRENCH | |
2010-02-26 | JUD RPT 1DP 2NR | |
2010-02-19 | COSPONSOR(S): ELLIS, FRENCH, DAVIS | |
2010-02-08 | COSPONSOR(S): MENARD | |
2010-02-05 | JUD, FIN | |
2010-02-05 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |