AK SB25 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the establishment and maintenance of an Internet website providing information on state government financial transactions and specifying the information to be made available on the website; and relating to the Alaska Checkbook Online Internet website.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Gov't Finances: Website

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSB 25(FIN) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-18SenateAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2022-05-18SenateCONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
2022-05-18SenateCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
2022-05-17HouseVERSION: HCS CSSB 25(STA)
2022-05-17HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2022-05-17HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, MCCARTY
2022-05-17HousePASSED Y36 E3 A1
2022-05-17HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 25(STA)
2022-05-17HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2022-05-17HouseSTA HCS ADOPTED UC
2022-05-17HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2022-05-17HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2022
2022-05-17HouseFN2: (ADM)
2022-05-17HouseNR: WOOL, JOSEPHSON, MERRICK
2022-05-17HouseDP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, FOSTER
2022-05-17HouseFIN RPT HCS(STA) 3DP 3NR
2022-05-05HouseFN2: (ADM)
2022-05-05HouseDP: CLAMAN, STORY, KAUFMAN, EASTMAN, TARR, VANCE, KREISS-TOMKINS
2022-05-05HouseSTA RPT HCS(STA) 7DP
2022-05-04HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): CLAMAN
2022-02-23HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): STORY
2022-02-21HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): VANCE
2022-02-16HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): EDGMON, TARR
2022-02-14HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): SNYDER
2022-02-11HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, HOPKINS, NELSON
2022-02-07HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN
2022-02-04HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER, SCHRAGE, DRUMMOND, SPOHNHOLZ, TUCK, FIELDS, HANNAN
2022-02-04HouseSTA, FIN
2022-02-04HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2022-02-02SenateVERSION: CSSB 25(FIN)
2022-02-02SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2022-02-02SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2022-02-02SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 25(FIN)
2022-02-01SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/2 CALENDAR
2022-02-01SenateFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2022-02-01SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2022-01-31SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 2/1/2022
2022-01-25SenateFN2: (ADM)
2022-01-25SenateDP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, WILSON, WIELECHOWSKI
2022-01-25SenateFIN RPT CS 5DP NEW TITLE
2021-04-09SenateFN1: (ADM)
2021-04-09SenateDP: COSTELLO, KAWASAKI
2021-04-09SenateNR: SHOWER, HOLLAND, REINBOLD
2021-04-09SenateSTA RPT CS 2DP 3NR NEW TITLE
2021-02-03SenateREVAK, GRAY-JACKSON, MICCICHE
2021-02-03SenateCOSPONSOR(S): REINBOLD, HUGHES, KAWASAKI, BEGICH, KIEHL, COSTELLO, WILSON,
2021-01-22SenateSTA, FIN
2021-01-22SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-01-22SenatePREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback