AK SB248 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/2/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/2/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act extending the termination date of the Board of Marital and Family Therapy; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Extend Bd Of Marital & Family Therapy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/2/10 | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/1 CHAPTER 32 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | 2:15 PM 5/27/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-14 | VERSION: CSSB 248(L&C) | |
2010-04-14 | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-14 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-14 | PASSED Y38 A2 | |
2010-04-14 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 248(L&C) | |
2010-04-14 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-14 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-14 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | FN2: (CED) | |
2010-04-13 | HAWKER | |
2010-04-13 | DP: DOOGAN, THOMAS, JOULE, GARA, AUSTERMAN, N.FOSTER, FAIRCLOUGH, STOLTZE, | |
2010-04-13 | FIN RPT 9DP | |
2010-04-09 | FN2: (CED) | |
2010-04-09 | NR: BUCH | |
2010-04-09 | DP: LYNN, CHENAULT, NEUMAN, HOLMES, T.WILSON, OLSON | |
2010-04-09 | L&C RPT 6DP 1NR | |
2010-03-26 | L&C, FIN | |
2010-03-26 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-03-25 | VERSION: CSSB 248(L&C) | |
2010-03-25 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2010-03-25 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-03-25 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2010-03-25 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 248(L&C) | |
2010-03-25 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-25 | L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-25 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-25 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/25/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | FN2: (CED) | |
2010-03-24 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, EGAN, OLSON, ELLIS | |
2010-03-24 | FIN RPT CS(L&C) 7DP | |
2010-02-24 | FN1: (CED) | |
2010-02-24 | DP: PASKVAN, MEYER, THOMAS, DAVIS, BUNDE | |
2010-02-24 | L&C RPT CS 5DP SAME TITLE | |
2010-01-29 | L&C, FIN | |
2010-01-29 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |