AK SB243 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to geothermal resources; relating to the royalty obligation for geothermal resources; transferring from the Department of Natural Resources to the Alaska Oil and Gas Conservation Commission authority over permitting and inspection of geothermal wells; providing for a regulatory cost charge for geothermal wells; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Geothermal Resource:royalty/permit/fee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/2 CHAPTER 38 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | MANIFEST ERROR(S) | |
2010-07-09 | 2:15 PM 5/27/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-17 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-17 | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N- | |
2010-04-17 | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP | |
2010-04-16 | VERSION: HCS CSSB 243(RES) | |
2010-04-16 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED | |
2010-04-16 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, PETERSEN, KERTTULA, GARDNER, MILLETT, CISSNA | |
2010-04-16 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-16 | PASSED Y27 E1 A12 | |
2010-04-16 | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 243(RES) | |
2010-04-16 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-16 | RES HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-16 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-16 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2010 | |
2010-04-15 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): FAIRCLOUGH, THOMAS, GARA, HAWKER | |
2010-04-15 | FN4: ZERO(ADM) | |
2010-04-15 | FN3: ZERO(DNR) | |
2010-04-15 | FN2: ZERO(REV) | |
2010-04-15 | DP: THOMAS, FAIRCLOUGH, DOOGAN, N.FOSTER, JOULE, KELLY, GARA, HAWKER | |
2010-04-15 | FIN RPT HCS(RES) 8DP | |
2010-04-14 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN | |
2010-04-14 | FN4: ZERO(ADM) | |
2010-04-14 | FN3: ZERO(DNR) | |
2010-04-14 | FN2: ZERO(REV) | |
2010-04-14 | DP: LYNN, NEUMAN, HOLMES, T.WILSON, OLSON | |
2010-04-14 | L&C RPT HCS(RES) 5DP | |
2010-04-11 | FN4: ZERO(ADM) | |
2010-04-11 | FN3: ZERO(DNR) | |
2010-04-11 | FN2: ZERO(REV) | |
2010-04-11 | DP: GUTTENBERG, EDGMON, OLSON, JOHNSON, NEUMAN | |
2010-04-11 | RES RPT HCS(RES) 5DP | |
2010-04-06 | RES, L&C, FIN | |
2010-04-06 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-04-05 | VERSION: CSSB 243(FIN) | |
2010-04-05 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2010-04-05 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-05 | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y17 N2 A1 | |
2010-04-05 | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY Y16 N3 A1 | |
2010-04-05 | BUNDE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION | |
2010-04-05 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-05 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2010-04-05 | STEDMAN, THOMAS, DYSON, KOOKESH, WAGONER | |
2010-04-05 | COSPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, HOFFMAN, EGAN, MENARD, MEYER, HUGGINS, PASKVAN, | |
2010-04-05 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 243(FIN) | |
2010-04-05 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-05 | AM NO 1 FAILED Y3 N17 | |
2010-04-05 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-05 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-05 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/5/2010 | |
2010-04-02 | FN4: ZERO(ADM) | |
2010-04-02 | FN3: ZERO(DNR) | |
2010-04-02 | FN2: ZERO(REV) | |
2010-04-02 | NR: OLSON | |
2010-04-02 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, EGAN, ELLIS | |
2010-04-02 | FIN RPT CS 6DP 1NR NEW TITLE | |
2010-03-22 | FN2: ZERO(REV) | |
2010-03-22 | FN1: ZERO(DNR) | |
2010-03-22 | NR: WIELECHOWSKI, STEVENS, FRENCH | |
2010-03-22 | DP: MCGUIRE | |
2010-03-22 | RES RPT CS 1DP 3NR NEW TITLE | |
2010-01-27 | RES, FIN | |
2010-01-27 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |