AK SB24 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/23/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/23/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act naming the bridge over Hammer Slough on Nordic Drive in Petersburg the Louis Miller Bridge.
Title
Louis Miller Bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/23/10 | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/25 CHAPTER 105 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | MANIFEST ERROR(S) | |
2010-07-09 | 2:55 PM 6/14/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-18 | VERSION: SB 24 | |
2010-04-18 | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-18 | PASSED Y33 A7 | |
2010-04-18 | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 24 | |
2010-04-18 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-18 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-18 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2010 | |
2010-04-17 | FN2: (DOT) | |
2010-04-17 | NR: GARA, SALMON, HAWKER | |
2010-04-17 | DP: THOMAS, DOOGAN, JOULE, FAIRCLOUGH, AUSTERMAN, KELLY, STOLTZE | |
2010-04-17 | FIN RPT 7DP 3NR | |
2009-04-08 | FN1: (DOT) | |
2009-04-08 | DP: MUNOZ, DOOGAN, GRUENBERG, JOHNSON, P.WILSON | |
2009-04-08 | TRA RPT 5DP | |
2009-04-02 | TRA, FIN | |
2009-04-02 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-04-01 | VERSION: SB 24 | |
2009-04-01 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2009-04-01 | PASSED Y19 N- V1 | |
2009-04-01 | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 24 | |
2009-04-01 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-01 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-04-01 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/1/2009 | |
2009-03-30 | FN1: (DOT) | |
2009-03-30 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, ELLIS, HUGGINS | |
2009-03-30 | FIN RPT 5DP | |
2009-02-04 | FN1: (DOT) | |
2009-02-04 | DP: KOOKESH, DAVIS, MEYER, PASKVAN | |
2009-02-04 | TRA RPT 4DP | |
2009-01-21 | TRA, FIN | |
2009-01-21 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-01-21 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/09 |