AK SB235 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/19/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/19/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to charter school approval and funding.
Title
Charter School Funding & Approval
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/19/10 | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/21 CHAPTER 91 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | MANIFEST ERROR(S) | |
2010-07-09 | 2:55 PM 6/14/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-16 | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y18 N- E1 A1 | |
2010-04-16 | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP | |
2010-04-15 | VERSION: HCS SB 235(FIN) | |
2010-04-15 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED | |
2010-04-15 | PASSED Y39 E1 | |
2010-04-15 | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 235(FIN) | |
2010-04-15 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-15 | FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-15 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-15 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2010 | |
2010-04-15 | FN3: ZERO(H.FIN/EED) | |
2010-04-15 | THOMAS, STOLTZE, HAWKER | |
2010-04-15 | DP: DOOGAN, N.FOSTER, FAIRCLOUGH, GARA, AUSTERMAN, JOULE, SALMON, KELLY, | |
2010-04-15 | FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 11DP | |
2010-04-09 | FIN | |
2010-04-09 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-04-08 | VERSION: SB 235 | |
2010-04-08 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2010-04-08 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2010-04-08 | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 235 | |
2010-04-08 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-08 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-08 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | FN2: (EED) | |
2010-04-07 | NR: OLSON | |
2010-04-07 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, ELLIS | |
2010-04-07 | FIN RPT 5DP 1NR | |
2010-02-08 | FN1: (EED) | |
2010-02-08 | NR: OLSON | |
2010-02-08 | DP: THOMAS, MEYER, DAVIS, STEVENS, HUGGINS | |
2010-02-08 | EDC RPT 5DP 1NR | |
2010-01-22 | EDC, FIN | |
2010-01-22 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |