AK SB224 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-18 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-18 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the AlaskAdvantage education grant program; relating to professional student exchange program availability; establishing the Alaska merit scholarship program and relating to the program; relating to student records; making conforming amendments; establishing a Joint Legislative Higher Education Scholarship Task Force; establishing an advisory task force on higher education and career readiness in the legislative branch of government; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Postsecondary Scholarships
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-18 | REFERRED TO EDUCATION | |
2010-04-18 | EDC | |
2010-04-18 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-04-17 | VERSION: CSSB 224(FIN) | |
2010-04-17 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2010-04-17 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-17 | PASSED Y15 N- A5 | |
2010-04-17 | ADOPTED SENATE LETTER OF INTENT | |
2010-04-17 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 224(FIN) | |
2010-04-17 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-17 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-17 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-17 | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/17/10 | |
2010-04-17 | FN6: (S.FIN/EED) | |
2010-04-17 | NR: STEDMAN, HUGGINS, OLSON | |
2010-04-17 | DP: HOFFMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, ELLIS | |
2010-04-17 | FIN RPT CS 4DP 3NR NEW TITLE | |
2010-03-26 | FN5: (EED) | |
2010-03-26 | FN4: (EED) | |
2010-03-26 | FN2: (REV) | |
2010-03-26 | FN1: (LWF) | |
2010-03-26 | AM: HUGGINS | |
2010-03-26 | NR: OLSON | |
2010-03-26 | DP: MEYER, THOMAS, STEVENS, DAVIS | |
2010-03-26 | EDC RPT CS 4DP 1NR 1AM NEW TITLE | |
2010-01-19 | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER | |
2010-01-19 | FN4: (EED) | |
2010-01-19 | FN3: (EED) | |
2010-01-19 | FN2: (REV) | |
2010-01-19 | FN1: (LWF) | |
2010-01-19 | EDC, FIN | |
2010-01-19 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |