AK SB22 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-30 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/23/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act repealing the termination date for the intensive management hunting license surcharge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Intensive Mgmt Surcharge/repeal Term Date

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-30SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 11/23/21
2021-08-30SenateSIGNED INTO LAW 8/25 CHAPTER 26 SLA 21
2021-08-23Senate4:45 P.M. 8/20/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2021-05-17HouseVERSION: SB 22
2021-05-17HouseRETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2021-05-17HousePASSED Y38 N2
2021-05-17HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 22
2021-05-17HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2021-05-17HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2021-05-17HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2021
2021-04-21HouseFN2: (DFG)
2021-04-21HouseAM: WOOL
2021-04-21HouseNR: EDGMON
2021-04-21HouseDNP: JOSEPHSON
2021-04-21HouseDP: ORTIZ, LEBON, THOMPSON, JOHNSON, RASMUSSEN, CARPENTER, MERRICK, FOSTER
2021-04-21HouseFIN RPT 8DP 1DNP 1NR 1AM
2021-03-29HouseFN2: (DFG)
2021-03-29HouseNR: HOPKINS
2021-03-29HouseDP: MCKAY, CRONK, RAUSCHER, HANNAN, GILLHAM, SCHRAGE, PATKOTAK
2021-03-29HouseRES RPT 7DP 1NR
2021-03-12HouseRES, FIN
2021-03-12HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-03-10SenateVERSION: SB 22
2021-03-10SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2021-03-10SenatePASSED Y18 N1 E1
2021-03-10SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 22
2021-03-10SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2021-03-10SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2021-03-10SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 3/10/2021
2021-03-08SenateFN2: (DFG)
2021-03-08SenateDP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, WILSON, OLSON, VON IMHOF
2021-03-08SenateFIN RPT 5DP
2021-02-17SenateFN1: (DFG)
2021-02-17SenateNR: KIEHL, KAWASAKI
2021-02-17SenateDP: REVAK, STEVENS, MICCICHE
2021-02-17SenateRES RPT 3DP 2NR
2021-01-22SenateRES, FIN
2021-01-22SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-01-22SenatePREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback