AK SB216 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-08 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 8/31/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-08 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 8/31/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the calculation of state aid for schools that consolidate; relating to the determination of the number of schools in a district; and providing for an effective date.
Title
School Funding For Consolidated Schools
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-08 | Senate | DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 8/31/18 |
2018-08-08 | Senate | 3:08 PM 8/8/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-27 | House | FN3: (EED/FUND CAP) |
2018-06-27 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 286 |
2018-06-27 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18 |
2018-06-27 | Senate | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18 |
2018-05-01 | House | VERSION: CSSB 216(FIN) |
2018-05-01 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-05-01 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-05-01 | House | PASSED Y35 N3 E2 |
2018-05-01 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 216(FIN) |
2018-04-30 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/1 CALENDAR |
2018-04-30 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-30 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/2018 |
2018-04-23 | House | FN4: ZERO(EED) |
2018-04-23 | House | FN3: (EED/FUND CAP) |
2018-04-23 | House | NR: WILSON, KAWASAKI, TILTON, PRUITT, ORTIZ, GUTTENBERG, THOMPSON |
2018-04-23 | House | DP: GARA, GRENN, SEATON, FOSTER |
2018-04-23 | House | FIN RPT 4DP 7NR |
2018-04-13 | House | FIN |
2018-04-13 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-13 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 216(FIN) |
2018-04-13 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2018-04-13 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-04-13 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2018-04-13 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 216(FIN) |
2018-04-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-13 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-13 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-13 | Senate | WILSON MOTION TO ABSTAIN FROM VOTING |
2018-04-13 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2018 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(EED) |
2018-04-10 | Senate | FN3: (EED/FUND CAP) |
2018-04-10 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, OLSON, MICCICHE |
2018-04-10 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 7DP SAME TITLE |
2018-03-28 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(EED) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | FN1: (EED/FUND CAP) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | AM: GIESSEL |
2018-03-28 | Senate | NR: HUGHES |
2018-03-28 | Senate | DP: STEVENS, BEGICH, COGHILL |
2018-03-28 | Senate | EDC RPT 3DP 1NR 1AM |
2018-03-21 | Senate | EDC, FIN |
2018-03-21 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |