AK SB209 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-14 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-14 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act prohibiting smoking in certain locations; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Regulation Of Smoking
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-04-14 | Senate | FN8: INDETERMINATE(DHS) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | FN7: ZERO(DEC) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | FN5: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | FN4: (DOT) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | FN3: (DOT) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | FN2: (DOT) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | FN1: (DOT) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | AM: FAIRCLOUGH, BISHOP |
2014-04-14 | Senate | NR: KELLY, OLSON |
2014-04-14 | Senate | DNP: DUNLEAVY |
2014-04-14 | Senate | DP: MEYER, HOFFMAN |
2014-04-14 | Senate | FIN RPT CS(HSS) 2DP 1DNP 2NR 2AM |
2014-04-09 | Senate | FN7: ZERO(DEC) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | FN6: INDETERMINATE(DHS) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | FN5: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | FN4: (DOT) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | FN3: (DOT) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | FN2: (DOT) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | FN1: (DOT) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | NR: STEDMAN |
2014-04-09 | Senate | DP: MICCICHE, ELLIS |
2014-04-09 | Senate | HSS RPT CS 2DP 1NR NEW TITLE |
2014-04-04 | Senate | FN7: ZERO(DEC) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | FN6: INDETERMINATE(DHS) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | FN5: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | FN4: (DOT) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | FN3: (DOT) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | FN2: (DOT) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | FN1: (DOT) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | AM: DYSON, GIESSEL |
2014-04-04 | Senate | DP: WIELECHOWSKI |
2014-04-04 | Senate | STA RPT CS 1DP 2AM NEW TITLE |
2014-03-03 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): ELLIS |
2014-02-26 | Senate | STA, HSS, FIN |
2014-02-26 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Airports
Boats & Boating
Bonds & Bonding
Buildings
Business
Civil Procedure
Courts
Crimes
Day Care
Dentists
Education
Employment
Executive Branch
Fairs
Families
Fees
Food
Gambling
Government Organization
Health & Social Services
Hospitals
Housing
Internet
Labor
Landlord & Tenant
Marine Facilities
Marine Highway
Medical Care
Mental Health
Minors
Motor Vehicles
Municipalities
Nonprofit Organizations
Nursing Homes
Occupations & Professions
Parks & Recreation
Physicians
Pioneers' Homes
Privacy
Privileges & Immunities
Property
Public Accommodations
Public Corporations
Public Employees
Public Land
Public Safety
Religion
Residential Care
Rights
Safety
Sales
Schools
Tobacco
Transportation
Universities
Unorganized Borough
Vessels
Youth Centers
Boats & Boating
Bonds & Bonding
Buildings
Business
Civil Procedure
Courts
Crimes
Day Care
Dentists
Education
Employment
Executive Branch
Fairs
Families
Fees
Food
Gambling
Government Organization
Health & Social Services
Hospitals
Housing
Internet
Labor
Landlord & Tenant
Marine Facilities
Marine Highway
Medical Care
Mental Health
Minors
Motor Vehicles
Municipalities
Nonprofit Organizations
Nursing Homes
Occupations & Professions
Parks & Recreation
Physicians
Pioneers' Homes
Privacy
Privileges & Immunities
Property
Public Accommodations
Public Corporations
Public Employees
Public Land
Public Safety
Religion
Residential Care
Rights
Safety
Sales
Schools
Tobacco
Transportation
Universities
Unorganized Borough
Vessels
Youth Centers