AK SB209 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/2/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/2/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing the Alaska State Council on the Arts the authority to adopt regulations relating to its statutory powers and duties; and providing for an effective date.
Title
State Council On The Arts; Regulations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/2/10 | |
2010-07-09 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/1 CHAPTER 30 SLA 10 | |
2010-07-09 | 2:15 PM 5/27/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-13 | VERSION: SB 209 | |
2010-04-13 | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-13 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-04-13 | PASSED Y36 A4 | |
2010-04-13 | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 209 | |
2010-04-13 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-04-13 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-04-13 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2010 | |
2010-03-29 | FN1: ZERO(EED) | |
2010-03-29 | NR: KELLER | |
2010-03-29 | DP: P.WILSON, EDGMON, GARDNER, BUCH, SEATON | |
2010-03-29 | EDC RPT 5DP 1NR | |
2010-03-23 | EDC | |
2010-03-23 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-03-22 | VERSION: SB 209 | |
2010-03-22 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2010-03-22 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2010-03-22 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2010-03-22 | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 209 | |
2010-03-22 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2010-03-22 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2010-03-22 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/22/2010 | |
2010-03-10 | FN1: ZERO(EED) | |
2010-03-10 | DP: FRENCH, COGHILL, EGAN | |
2010-03-10 | JUD RPT 3DP | |
2010-02-17 | FN1: ZERO(EED) | |
2010-02-17 | DP: THOMAS, MEYER, DAVIS, STEVENS, HUGGINS | |
2010-02-17 | EDC RPT 5DP | |
2010-01-19 | EDC, JUD | |
2010-01-19 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2010-01-19 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/10 |