AK SB208 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 28 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act establishing the month of March as Sobriety Awareness Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

March: Sobriety Awareness Month

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-30SenateAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-04-28HouseJOSEPHSON, GRENN
2018-04-28HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): ZULKOSKY, TARR, EDGMON, KAWASAKI, MILLETT, DRUMMOND, LEDOUX,
2018-04-28HouseVERSION: SB 208
2018-04-28HouseRETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-04-28HousePASSED Y36 E4
2018-04-28HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 208
2018-04-27HouseADJOURNED TO 4/28 CALENDAR
2018-04-26HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): BIRCH
2018-04-26HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/27 CALENDAR
2018-04-26HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-26HouseSESSION CANCELED 4/25 - ON 4/26 CALENDAR
2018-04-26HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/25/2018
2018-04-18HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2018-04-18HouseDP: JOHNSTON, TARR, ZULKOSKY, KITO, SPOHNHOLZ
2018-04-18HouseHSS RPT 5DP
2018-04-13HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): SADDLER, TUCK
2018-04-13HouseHSS
2018-04-13HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-04-12SenateVERSION: SB 208
2018-04-12SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2018-04-12SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2018-04-12SenateSHOWER, COSTELLO, BISHOP, KELLY
2018-04-12SenateCOSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, MEYER, HUGHES, EGAN, MACKINNON, GIESSEL, VON IMHOF
2018-04-12SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 208
2018-04-12SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-12SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-12SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2018
2018-04-11SenateSTA REFERRAL WAIVED UC
2018-04-10SenateFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2018-04-10SenateDP: WILSON, BEGICH, MICCICHE, GIESSEL
2018-04-10SenateHSS RPT 4DP
2018-02-28SenateCOSPONSOR(S): OLSON
2018-02-19SenateHSS, STA
2018-02-19SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback