AK SB208 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 28 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 28 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing the month of March as Sobriety Awareness Month.
Title
March: Sobriety Awareness Month
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV |
2018-04-28 | House | JOSEPHSON, GRENN |
2018-04-28 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): ZULKOSKY, TARR, EDGMON, KAWASAKI, MILLETT, DRUMMOND, LEDOUX, |
2018-04-28 | House | VERSION: SB 208 |
2018-04-28 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-04-28 | House | PASSED Y36 E4 |
2018-04-28 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 208 |
2018-04-27 | House | ADJOURNED TO 4/28 CALENDAR |
2018-04-26 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): BIRCH |
2018-04-26 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/27 CALENDAR |
2018-04-26 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-26 | House | SESSION CANCELED 4/25 - ON 4/26 CALENDAR |
2018-04-26 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/25/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2018-04-18 | House | DP: JOHNSTON, TARR, ZULKOSKY, KITO, SPOHNHOLZ |
2018-04-18 | House | HSS RPT 5DP |
2018-04-13 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): SADDLER, TUCK |
2018-04-13 | House | HSS |
2018-04-13 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-12 | Senate | VERSION: SB 208 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2018-04-12 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2018-04-12 | Senate | SHOWER, COSTELLO, BISHOP, KELLY |
2018-04-12 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, MEYER, HUGHES, EGAN, MACKINNON, GIESSEL, VON IMHOF |
2018-04-12 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 208 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-12 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-12 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | STA REFERRAL WAIVED UC |
2018-04-10 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2018-04-10 | Senate | DP: WILSON, BEGICH, MICCICHE, GIESSEL |
2018-04-10 | Senate | HSS RPT 4DP |
2018-02-28 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): OLSON |
2018-02-19 | Senate | HSS, STA |
2018-02-19 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |