AK SB205 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the Regulatory Commission of Alaska; relating to the public utility regulatory cost charge; and relating to telecommunications regulations, exemptions, charges, and rates.
Title
Telecommunications Regulation/exemptions
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Meyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Amendment No. 2 (Y: 4 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 7 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 7 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Amendment No. 2 (Y: 4 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 7 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 7 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | House | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2018-04-11 | House | JUD, L&C |
2018-04-11 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-09 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 205(L&C) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | PASSED Y16 N4 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2018-04-09 | Senate | AM NO 3 FAILED Y5 N15 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | AM NO 2 FAILED Y4 N16 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | AM NO 1 FAILED Y7 N13 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS UC |
2018-04-09 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 205(L&C) |
2018-04-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/9 CALENDAR |
2018-04-06 | Senate | L&C CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-06 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-06 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/6/2018 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2018-04-04 | Senate | NR: GARDNER |
2018-04-04 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, MICCICHE, MEYER |
2018-04-04 | Senate | L&C RPT CS 3DP 1NR NEW TITLE |
2018-02-19 | Senate | L&C |
2018-02-19 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |