AK SB204 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to charitable gaming online ticket sales and activities; relating to charitable gaming proceeds; establishing the Kenai River Freeze-Up Classic; relating to displaying fishing, hunting, and trapping licenses on an electronic device; relating to auctions or raffles for hunting harvest permits, bear viewing permits, and big game tags; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Hunting License/permit; Charitable Gaming
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendments to CSSB 204(RES) Effective Date(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2022-06-30 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 14 SLA 22 |
2022-06-20 | Senate | 10:45 A.M. 6/20/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-06 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2022-05-18 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-05-18 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N- |
2022-05-18 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP |
2022-05-17 | House | VERSION: HCS CSSB 204(FIN) AM H |
2022-05-17 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2022-05-17 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): VANCE, KAUFMAN |
2022-05-17 | House | TITLE CHANGE: HCR 20 |
2022-05-17 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y38 E1 A1 |
2022-05-17 | House | PASSED Y36 N2 E1 A1 |
2022-05-17 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 204(FIN) AM H |
2022-05-17 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2022-05-17 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2022-05-17 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2022-05-17 | House | FIN HCS ADOPTED UC |
2022-05-17 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-17 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2022 |
2022-05-17 | House | FN1: INDETERMINATE(DFG) |
2022-05-17 | House | NR: WOOL, JOHNSON |
2022-05-17 | House | DP: ORTIZ, LEBON, MERRICK, FOSTER |
2022-05-17 | House | TITLE CHANGE: HCR 20 |
2022-05-17 | House | FIN RPT HCS(FIN) NEW TITLE 4DP 2NR |
2022-05-03 | House | FN1: INDETERMINATE(DFG) |
2022-05-03 | House | NR: HOPKINS, HANNAN, SCHRAGE, PATKOTAK |
2022-05-03 | House | DP: MCKAY, CRONK, GILLHAM |
2022-05-03 | House | RES RPT 3DP 4NR |
2022-04-13 | House | RES, FIN |
2022-04-13 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-04-11 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 204(RES) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2022-04-11 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-04-11 | Senate | PASSED Y16 N- E2 A2 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 204(RES) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/11 CAL |
2022-04-08 | Senate | RES CS ADOPTED UC |
2022-04-08 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-04-08 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | FN1: INDETERMINATE(DFG) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | NR: STEDMAN, OLSON |
2022-04-06 | Senate | DP: BISHOP, HOFFMAN, WILSON, WIELECHOWSKI, VON IMHOF |
2022-04-06 | Senate | FIN RPT CS(RES) 5DP 2NR SAME TITLE |
2022-03-18 | Senate | FN1: INDETERMINATE(DFG) |
2022-03-18 | Senate | NR: KAWASAKI |
2022-03-18 | Senate | DP: REVAK, STEVENS, MICCICHE, VON IMHOF, KIEHL |
2022-03-18 | Senate | RES RPT CS 5DP 1NR SAME TITLE |
2022-02-22 | Senate | RES, FIN |
2022-02-22 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Auctions
Boards & Commissions
Education
Fish & Game (game)
Funds
Governor
Internet
Licensing
Nonprofit Organizations
Parks & Recreation
Permits
Resources
Boards & Commissions
Education
Fish & Game (game)
Funds
Governor
Internet
Licensing
Nonprofit Organizations
Parks & Recreation
Permits
Resources