AK SB204 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - MANIFEST ERROR(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to a veteran's designation on an identification card or a driver's license for Hmong veterans and Lao veterans; relating to registration plates celebrating the arts; relating to special motor vehicle registration plates for recipients of the Bronze Star awarded for valor, Silver Star, Navy Cross, Distinguished Service Cross, Air Force Cross, Coast Guard Cross, and other awards reflecting valor; relating to special registration plates for vehicles owned by veterans with disabilities; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vet/valor/arts/disabled Plates;lao Id/lic

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendments to SB 204 Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 13 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18SenateMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2018-05-12SenateAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-05-12SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-12SenateCONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- E1
2018-05-12SenateCOSPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, BEGICH, STEVENS, COSTELLO, BISHOP
2018-05-12SenateCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP UC
2018-05-11SenateCONCUR MESSAGE READ
2018-05-10HouseVERSION: HCS SB 204(STA) AM H
2018-05-10HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2018-05-10HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): TARR
2018-05-10HouseTITLE CHANGE: HCR 32
2018-05-10HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y38 E1 A1
2018-05-10HousePASSED Y37 N1 E1 A1
2018-05-10HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 204(STA) AM H
2018-05-09HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): GARA, LEDOUX, KAWASAKI, JOSEPHSON, SADDLER
2018-05-09HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/10 CALENDAR
2018-05-09House...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2018-05-09HouseAM NO 2 ADOPTED Y40
2018-05-09HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y13 N26 A1
2018-05-09HouseSTA HCS ADOPTED UC
2018-05-09HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-08HouseADJOURNED TO 5/9 CALENDAR
2018-05-08HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/2018
2018-04-26HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): KOPP
2018-04-18HouseFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2018-04-18HouseDP: TUCK, BIRCH, KNOPP, WOOL, LEDOUX, JOHNSON, KREISS-TOMKINS
2018-04-18HousePENDING TITLE CHANGE HCR
2018-04-18HouseSTA RPT HCS(STA) NT 7DP
2018-03-09HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK
2018-03-09HouseSTA
2018-03-09HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-03-07SenateVERSION: SB 204
2018-03-07SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2018-03-07SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2018-03-07SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 204
2018-03-07SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-03-07SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-03-07SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 3/7/2018
2018-02-28SenateFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2018-02-28SenateNR: WILSON
2018-02-28SenateDP: MEYER, GIESSEL, COGHILL, EGAN
2018-02-28SenateSTA RPT 4DP 1NR
2018-02-19SenateSTA
2018-02-19SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback