AK SB204 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/4/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/4/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act naming a shooting range in the Knik River Public Use Area the Kenny and Patti Barber Shooting Range.
Title
Kenny & Patti Barber Shooting Range
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-11 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/4/16 |
2016-07-11 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/6 CHAPTER 35 SLA 16 |
2016-07-11 | Senate | 2:13 PM 6/20/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-04-11 | House | VERSION: SB 204 |
2016-04-11 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2016-04-11 | House | PASSED Y39 E1 |
2016-04-11 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 204 |
2016-04-11 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2016-04-11 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-04-11 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2016 |
2016-04-09 | House | FN1: ZERO(DNR) |
2016-04-09 | House | NAGEAK |
2016-04-09 | House | DP: JOHNSON, JOSEPHSON, HERRON, CHENAULT, OLSON, TARR, SEATON, TALERICO, |
2016-04-09 | House | RES RPT 9DP |
2016-04-04 | House | RES |
2016-04-04 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2016-04-01 | Senate | VERSION: SB 204 |
2016-04-01 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2016-04-01 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2016-04-01 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 204 |
2016-04-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2016-04-01 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2016-03-31 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/1/2016 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DNR) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | DP: STOLTZE, COGHILL, HUGGINS, WIELECHOWSKI |
2016-03-23 | Senate | STA RPT 4DP |
2016-03-16 | Senate | STA |
2016-03-16 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |