AK SB202 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the liability of a Native corporation for the release or threatened release of hazardous substances present on certain lands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Native Corp. Liability For Contamination

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to SB 202 (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-30SenateAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-04-30SenateCONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
2018-04-30SenateCONCUR MESSAGE READ
2018-04-27HouseVERSION: HCS SB 202(JUD)
2018-04-27HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2018-04-27HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): STUTES, KOPP, SADDLER, ZULKOSKY
2018-04-27HousePASSED Y38 E2
2018-04-27HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 202(JUD)
2018-04-27HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-27HouseJUD HCS ADOPTED UC
2018-04-27HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-27HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/27/2018
2018-04-14HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): MILLETT, TUCK
2018-04-11HouseFN1: ZERO(DEC)
2018-04-11HouseAM: EASTMAN
2018-04-11HouseNR: REINBOLD
2018-04-11HouseDP: KOPP, KREISS-TOMKINS, STUTES, LEDOUX, CLAMAN
2018-04-11HouseJUD RPT HCS(JUD) 5DP 1NR 1AM
2018-04-09HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): EDGMON
2018-04-04HouseJUD
2018-04-04HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-04-02SenateVERSION: SB 202
2018-04-02SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2018-04-02SenatePASSED Y18 N- E2
2018-04-02SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SB 202
2018-04-02SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-02SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-02SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/2/2018
2018-03-29SenateFN1: ZERO(DEC)
2018-03-29SenateNR: KELLY
2018-03-29SenateDP: COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI, SHOWER, COSTELLO
2018-03-29SenateJUD RPT 4DP 1NR
2018-02-28SenateCOSPONSOR(S): BISHOP, GIESSEL, STEVENS, STEDMAN, OLSON
2018-02-28SenateFN1: ZERO(DEC)
2018-02-28SenateNR: STEDMAN, MEYER
2018-02-28SenateDP: GIESSEL, BISHOP, COGHILL, VON IMHOF
2018-02-28SenateRES RPT 4DP 2NR
2018-02-19SenateRES, JUD
2018-02-19SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback