AK SB193 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/30/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/30/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act extending the termination date of the Board of Chiropractic Examiners; requiring a report on audit compliance by the Board of Chiropractic Examiners; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Extend Bd Chiropractic Examiners; Audit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/30/22 |
2022-06-30 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 17 SLA 22 |
2022-06-21 | Senate | 11:40 A.M. 6/21/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-17 | House | VERSION: CSSB 193(FIN) |
2022-05-17 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2022-05-17 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-05-17 | House | PASSED Y39 E1 |
2022-05-17 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 193(FIN) |
2022-05-17 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2022-05-17 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-17 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2022 |
2022-05-09 | House | FN3: (CED) |
2022-05-09 | House | NR: JOHNSON, MERRICK |
2022-05-09 | House | DP: EDGMON, LEBON, JOSEPHSON, FOSTER |
2022-05-09 | House | FIN RPT 4DP 2NR |
2022-04-29 | House | FN3: (CED) |
2022-04-29 | House | NR: SNYDER |
2022-04-29 | House | DP: MCCARTY, SCHRAGE, KAUFMAN, NELSON, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ |
2022-04-29 | House | L&C RPT 6DP 1NR |
2022-04-09 | House | L&C, FIN |
2022-04-09 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-04-08 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 193(FIN) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-04-08 | Senate | PASSED Y16 N- E4 |
2022-04-08 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 193(FIN) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/8 CAL |
2022-04-06 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2022-04-06 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-04-06 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/7/2022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | FN2: (CED) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | NR: STEDMAN, WIELECHOWSKI |
2022-04-06 | Senate | DP: BISHOP, HOFFMAN, WILSON, OLSON, VON IMHOF |
2022-04-06 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 5DP 2NR NEW TITLE |
2022-03-23 | Senate | FN1: (CED) |
2022-03-23 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, GRAY-JACKSON, STEVENS, MICCICHE |
2022-03-23 | Senate | L&C RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE |
2022-02-15 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2022-02-15 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |