AK SB193 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): KOPP
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act requiring the Department of Health and Social Services to apply for a waiver to establish work requirements for certain adults who are eligible for the state medical assistance program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Med. Assistance Work Requirement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - On Reconsideration (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Take up Reconsideration Same Day (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 11 (Y: 4 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 10 (Y: 3 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 9 (Y: 4 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 8 (Y: 4 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 7 (Y: 4 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 6 (Y: 7 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 8 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 4 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 4 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 4 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): KOPP
2018-05-04HouseSENATE LETTER OF INTENT
2018-05-04HouseREFERRED TO HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES
2018-05-04HouseHSS, FIN
2018-05-04HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-05-03SenateVERSION: CSSB 193(HSS)
2018-05-03SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2018-05-03SenatePASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y14 N3 E2 A1
2018-05-03SenateRECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY Y14 N3 E2 A1
2018-05-03SenateWIELECHOWSKI NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2018-05-03SenatePASSED Y14 N4 E2
2018-05-03SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 193(HSS)
2018-05-03SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-05-03SenateAM NO 11 FAILED Y4 N14 E2
2018-05-03SenateAM NO 10 FAILED Y3 N14 E2 A1
2018-05-03SenateAM NO 9 FAILED Y4 N15 E1
2018-05-03SenateAM NO 8 FAILED Y4 N15 E1
2018-05-03SenateAM NO 7 FAILED Y4 N15 E1
2018-05-03SenateAM NO 6 FAILED Y7 N12 E1
2018-05-03SenateAM NO 5 FAILED Y8 N11 E1
2018-05-03SenateAM NO 4 FAILED Y4 N15 E1
2018-05-03SenateAM NO 3 FAILED Y4 N15 E1
2018-05-03SenateAM NO 2 FAILED Y4 N15 E1
2018-05-03SenateAM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
2018-05-03SenateADOPTED SENATE LETTER OF INTENT UC
2018-05-03SenateHSS CS ADOPTED UC
2018-05-03SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-03SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/2018
2018-05-03SenateFN12: (S.FIN/DHS)
2018-05-03SenateFN11: (S.FIN/DHS)
2018-05-03SenateFN10: (S.FIN/DHS)
2018-05-03SenateFN9: INDETERMINATE(S.FIN/ADM)
2018-05-03SenateFN8: ZERO(LWF)
2018-05-02SenateNR: STEVENS, OLSON
2018-05-02SenateDP: BISHOP, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE
2018-05-02SenateLETTER OF INTENT WITH FIN REPORT
2018-05-02SenateFIN RPT CS(HSS) 3DP 2NR
2018-03-28SenateFN8: ZERO(LWF)
2018-03-28SenateFN7: (DHS)
2018-03-28SenateFN6: (DHS)
2018-03-28SenateFN5: (DHS)
2018-03-28SenateFN4: (DHS)
2018-03-28SenateFN3: (DHS)
2018-03-28SenateFN2: (DHS)
2018-03-28SenateFN1: (ADM)
2018-03-28SenateNR: VON IMHOF
2018-03-28SenateDNP: BEGICH
2018-03-28SenateDP: WILSON, MICCICHE, GIESSEL
2018-03-28SenateHSS RPT CS 3DP 1DNP 1NR SAME TITLE
2018-02-19SenateCOSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, GIESSEL
2018-02-19SenateHSS, FIN
2018-02-19SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/30?Root=SB193
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/SB0193A.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/SB0193B.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB193&jrn=2949&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB193&jrn=2950&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB193&jrn=2951&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB193&jrn=2952&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB193&jrn=2953&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB193&jrn=2954&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB193&jrn=2955&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB193&jrn=2957&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB193&jrn=2958&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB193&jrn=2959&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=SB193&jrn=2965&hse=S

Bill Comments

feedback