AK SB19 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to allocations for the special education service agency; extending the special education service agency; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extend Special Education Service Agency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-19 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Limit Debate to 2 minutes (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-16SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
2021-08-16SenateSIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 12 SLA 21
2021-06-28Senate9:08 AM 6/28/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2021-06-28HouseFN2: (EED)
2021-06-28HouseFN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 69
2021-06-28HouseLEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/14/21
2021-08-16SenateLEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/14/21
2021-05-19HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND, STORY, TARR, JOSEPHSON
2021-05-19HouseVERSION: CSSB 19(FIN)
2021-05-19HouseRETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2021-05-19HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2021-05-19HousePASSED Y35 N5
2021-05-19HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 19(FIN)
2021-05-19HouseLIMIT ALL DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y23 N16 E1
2021-05-18HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/19 CALENDAR
2021-05-18HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2021-05-18HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2021
2021-04-26HouseFN2: (EED)
2021-04-26HouseNR: CARPENTER, JOHNSON, RASMUSSEN, THOMPSON
2021-04-26HouseDP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, LEBON, JOSEPHSON, MERRICK, FOSTER
2021-04-26HouseFIN RPT 6DP 4NR
2021-03-31HouseFIN
2021-03-31HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-03-29SenateVERSION: CSSB 19(FIN)
2021-03-29SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2021-03-29SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2021-03-29SenatePASSED Y15 N- E5
2021-03-29SenateCOSPONSOR(S): HOLLAND, REVAK
2021-03-29SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 19(FIN)
2021-03-26SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/29 CALENDAR
2021-03-26SenateFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2021-03-26SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2021-03-26SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 3/26/2021
2021-03-24SenateFN2: (EED)
2021-03-24SenateDP: BISHOP, HOFFMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, VON IMHOF
2021-03-24SenateNR: STEDMAN, WILSON, OLSON
2021-03-24SenateFIN RPT CS 4DP 3NR NEW TITLE
2021-02-17SenateFN1: (EED)
2021-02-17SenateDP: HOLLAND, HUGHES, STEVENS, MICCICHE, BEGICH
2021-02-17SenateEDC RPT CS 5DP SAME TITLE
2021-02-15SenateCOSPONSOR(S): HUGHES, BEGICH, GRAY-JACKSON, KAWASAKI, MICCICHE
2021-01-22SenateEDC, FIN
2021-01-22SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-01-22SenatePREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback