AK SB185 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Passed on October 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-05 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 12/12/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Passed on October 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-05 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 12/12/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to exemptions from minimum wage.
Title
Minimum Wage Exemptions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSB 185(L&C) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-05 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 12/12/22 |
2022-10-05 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 9/13 CHAPTER 74 SLA 22 |
2022-10-05 | Senate | 10:20 A.M. 8/30/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-18 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y17 N3 |
2022-05-18 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP |
2022-05-18 | House | VERSION: HCS CSSB 185(L&C) |
2022-05-18 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2022-05-18 | House | PASSED Y36 N2 A2 |
2022-05-18 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 185(L&C) |
2022-05-18 | House | LIMIT ALL INTROS TO 3 MIN, DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y36 N4 |
2022-05-17 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK |
2022-05-17 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/18 CALENDAR |
2022-05-17 | House | L&C HCS ADOPTED UC |
2022-05-17 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-17 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2022 |
2022-05-15 | House | FN1: ZERO(LWF) |
2022-05-15 | House | NR: SCHRAGE, MCCARTY |
2022-05-15 | House | DP: SNYDER, NELSON, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ |
2022-05-15 | House | L&C RPT HCS(L&C) 4DP 2NR |
2022-04-25 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): NELSON |
2022-03-22 | House | L&C |
2022-03-22 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-03-21 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 185(L&C) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N- E2 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): BISHOP, WILSON, STEDMAN, SHOWER, VON IMHOF |
2022-03-21 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 185(L&C) |
2022-03-18 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, KIEHL, BEGICH |
2022-03-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/21 CAL |
2022-03-18 | Senate | L&C CS ADOPTED UC |
2022-03-18 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-03-18 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/18/2022 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LWF) |
2022-03-18 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, GRAY-JACKSON, STEVENS, MICCICHE |
2022-03-18 | Senate | L&C RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE |
2022-03-15 | Senate | GRAY-JACKSON |
2022-03-15 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES, REVAK, COSTELLO, STEVENS, HOLLAND, WIELECHOWSKI |
2022-02-08 | Senate | L&C |
2022-02-08 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |