AK SB182 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOHNSON
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOHNSON
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing the crime of interference with emergency communications.
Title
Interference With Emergency Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOHNSON |
2022-05-18 | House | NOT TAKEN UP - ADJOURNED SINE DIE |
2022-05-18 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2022-05-18 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2022-05-17 | House | HELD TO 5/18 CALENDAR |
2022-05-17 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2022 |
2022-05-15 | House | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2022-05-15 | House | AM: KURKA |
2022-05-15 | House | NR: KREISS-TOMKINS |
2022-05-15 | House | DNP: EASTMAN |
2022-05-15 | House | DP: DRUMMOND, SNYDER, CLAMAN |
2022-05-15 | House | JUD RPT HCS(STA) 3DP 1DNP 1NR 1AM |
2022-05-09 | House | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2022-05-09 | House | NR: STORY, TARR |
2022-05-09 | House | DNP: EASTMAN |
2022-05-09 | House | DP: VANCE, CLAMAN |
2022-05-09 | House | STA RPT HCS(STA) 2DP 1DNP 2NR |
2022-03-14 | House | STA, JUD |
2022-03-14 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-03-09 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 182(JUD) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | PASSED Y14 N- E5 A1 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 182(JUD) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/9 CAL |
2022-03-08 | Senate | JUD CS ADOPTED UC |
2022-03-08 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-03-08 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/8/2022 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2022-03-04 | Senate | NR: SHOWER, KIEHL |
2022-03-04 | Senate | DP: HOLLAND, MYERS, HUGHES |
2022-03-04 | Senate | JUD RPT CS 3DP 2NR SAME TITLE |
2022-02-08 | Senate | JUD |
2022-02-08 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |