AK SB182 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act raising the minimum age to purchase, sell, exchange, or possess tobacco, a product containing nicotine, or an electronic smoking product; relating to the taxation of electronic smoking products; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Age For Nicotine/e-cig; Tax E-cig.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2020-03-11 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(LAW) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | FN3: (REV) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DHS) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2020-03-11 | Senate | NR: REVAK |
2020-03-11 | Senate | DP: BISHOP, GRAY-JACKSON, STEVENS |
2020-03-11 | Senate | L&C RPT CS 3DP 1NR NEW TITLE |
2020-03-02 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): GIESSEL |
2020-02-19 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): BEGICH, GRAY-JACKSON |
2020-02-10 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2020-02-10 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/31?Root=SB182 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/SB0182A.PDF |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/SB0182B.PDF |