AK SB173 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-05 - FN3: (CED)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-05 - FN3: (CED)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the practice of dentistry; relating to dental radiological equipment; relating to the practice of dental hygiene; relating to advanced practice permits for dental hygienists; relating to dental assistants; prohibiting unfair discrimination under group health insurance against a dental hygienist who holds an advanced practice permit; relating to medical assistance for dental hygiene services; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Dentists/dental Hygienist/radiolog Equip
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment(s) to CSSB 173(FIN) Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-05 | House | FN3: (CED) |
2022-10-05 | House | FN2: (DHS) |
2022-10-05 | House | FN1: (DHS) |
2022-10-05 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 281 |
2022-10-05 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/10/22 |
2022-10-05 | Senate | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/10/22 |
2022-10-05 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2022-10-05 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 8/10 CHAPTER 56 SLA 22 |
2022-10-05 | Senate | 9:45 A.M. 8/4/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-18 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-05-18 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- A1 |
2022-05-18 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP |
2022-05-17 | House | VERSION: CSSB 173(FIN) AM H |
2022-05-17 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2022-05-17 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): CRONK, LEBON |
2022-05-17 | House | TITLE CHANGE: HCR 21 |
2022-05-17 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-05-17 | House | PASSED Y36 N2 E1 A1 |
2022-05-17 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 173(FIN) AM H |
2022-05-17 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2022-05-17 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2022-05-17 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y36 N1 E1 A2 |
2022-05-17 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-17 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2022 |
2022-05-15 | House | FN3: (CED) |
2022-05-15 | House | FN2: (DHS) |
2022-05-15 | House | FN1: (DHS) |
2022-05-15 | House | NR: CARPENTER, JOSEPHSON, RASMUSSEN, MERRICK |
2022-05-15 | House | DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, LEBON, THOMPSON, JOHNSON, WOOL, FOSTER |
2022-05-15 | House | FIN RPT 7DP 4NR |
2022-04-29 | House | FIN |
2022-04-29 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-04-27 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 173(FIN) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2022-04-27 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-04-27 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 173(FIN) |
2022-04-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/27 CAL |
2022-04-25 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2022-04-25 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-04-25 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/25/2022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | FN3: (CED) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | FN2: (DHS) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | FN1: (DHS) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | NR: STEDMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON |
2022-04-06 | Senate | DP: BISHOP, HOFFMAN, WILSON, VON IMHOF |
2022-04-06 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 4DP 3NR SAME TITLE |
2022-02-11 | Senate | FN3: (CED) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | FN2: (DHS) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | FN1: (DHS) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | NR: MICCICHE |
2022-02-11 | Senate | DP: STEVENS, GRAY-JACKSON |
2022-02-11 | Senate | L&C RPT 2DP 1NR |
2022-01-28 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2022-01-28 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |