AK SB173 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to mobile intensive care paramedics; relating to duties of the State Medical Board and the Department of Health and Social Services; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

License Mobile Intensive Care Paramedics

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2020-03-18SenateFN2: ZERO(CED)
2020-03-18SenateFN1: ZERO(DHS)
2020-03-18SenateDP: BISHOP, GRAY-JACKSON, STEVENS, REVAK
2020-03-18SenateL&C RPT 4DP
2020-02-28SenateFN2: ZERO(CED)
2020-02-28SenateFN1: ZERO(DHS)
2020-02-28SenateNR: BEGICH, GIESSEL, SHOWER
2020-02-28SenateDP: WILSON, VON IMHOF
2020-02-28SenateHSS RPT 2DP 3NR
2020-02-17SenateCOSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE
2020-02-03SenateHSS, L&C
2020-02-03SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback